This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2020 at 08:29:03 (UTC).

Anderson v. Bishop et al

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 Anderson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Bishop. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rosanna Malouf Peterson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00083

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rosanna Malouf Peterson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Duane Anderson

Spokane, WA 99208

Defendants

Kristin AnChristine Anderson

Clyde Jacobs

Tom Jones

Robin Riddle

Marian Jacobs Fisk

Earl B Fisk

Our Community Church

Kootenai County Sheriffs Department

Christie Blaker

Minh H Lee

AnChristine Lundstrum

Viridian Management

Distintive Design Development Group LLC

Bureau of Indian Affairs

Walmart

Snohomish County

Rainbow Springs Behavioral Hospital

Bob Wall

Ed Backell

45 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's Complaint be DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (TR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) Objections to R&R due by 5/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (TR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RENEW APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Case Management Deadline set for 4/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (TR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals incomplete responses to the questions presented. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Case Management Deadline set for 3/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (TR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # IFP Pending) Jury Demand. Filed by Eric Duane Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's Complaint be DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (TR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) Objections to R&R due by 5/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (TR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RENEW APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Case Management Deadline set for 4/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (TR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals incomplete responses to the questions presented. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Case Management Deadline set for 3/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (TR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # IFP Pending) Jury Demand. Filed by Eric Duane Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kootenai County Sheriff Officers is a litigant

Latest cases where SNOHOMISH COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant