This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/18/2021 at 12:57:43 (UTC).

Anderson v. Alcon Surgical Inc et al

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 Anderson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Alcon Surgical Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lawrence R. Leonard and Arenda L. Wright Allen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00100

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lawrence R. Leonard

Presiding Judge

Arenda L. Wright Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Anderson

Defendants

william Doran

Kevin Clark

Bert Martin

Alcon Surgical Inc

ALCON SURGICAL INC.

ALCON INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Joseph Owen, III

Attorney at Owen & Owens PLC

15521 Midlothian Turnpike Suite 300, Po Box 717

Midlothian, VA 23113

Samuel Jonathan Kaufman

Attorney at Owen & Owens PLC

15521 Midlothian Turnpike Suite 300, Po Box 717

Midlothian, VA 23113

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#7

6 #1

Civil Motions Procedures

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Correction re [10- 13] Summons Returned Executed: The incorrect service date was entered as to each defendant. In the future, you should enter the date the defendant was served. You entered on these entries, 2/18/21, which was the date the summons was issued. (afar) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) First MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Kevin Clark by Christopher Anderson. (Owen, William) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) First MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Bert Martin by Christopher Anderson. (Owen, William) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) First MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss William Doran by Christopher Anderson. (Owen, William) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Alcon Surgical by Christopher Anderson. (Owen, William) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Anderson Bert Martin served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021 (Owen, William) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Anderson William Doran served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021 (Owen, William) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Anderson Kevin Clark served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021 (Owen, William) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Anderson ALCON SURGICAL INC. served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021 (Owen, William) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re #8 Affidavit of Service, #9 Affidavit of Service, #7 Affidavit of Service. Attorney notified that these documents should be refiled using the "Summons Returned Executed" event. (tamarm, ) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on William Doran on 2/18/21, filed by Christopher Anderson. (Owen, William) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on Kevin Clark on 2/18/21, filed by Christopher Anderson. (Owen, William) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on Alcon Surgical on 2/18/21, filed by Christopher Anderson. (Owen, William) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Four (4) Summonses Issued as to ALCON SURGICAL INC., Kevin Clark, William Doran, Bert Martin. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, ) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, ) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons Alcon Surgical by Christopher Anderson. (Owen, William) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons William Doran by Christopher Anderson. (Owen, William) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons Kevin Clark by Christopher Anderson. (Owen, William) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons Bert Martin by Christopher Anderson. (Owen, William) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7632710.), filed by Christopher Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Owen, William) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alcon is a litigant

Latest cases where Alcon Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant