This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:24:04 (UTC).

Saevik v. Swedish Medical Center et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Saevik filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Swedish Medical Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is John C Coughenour. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01992

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John C Coughenour

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shannon Anderson Saevik

Defendants

Swedish Medical Center

Rebecca Day

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Judith A Lonnquist

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JUDITH A. LONNQUIST

1218 Third Ave, Ste 1500

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorneys

Kristina Markosova

Attorney at DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE (SEA)

920 Fifth Ave, Ste 3300

Seattle, WA 98104-1610

Kathryn S Rosen

Attorney at DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE (SEA)

920 Fifth Ave, Ste 3300

Seattle, WA 98104-1610

Paula L Lehmann

Attorney at DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE (BELLEVUE)

929 108Th Ave Ne Ste 1500

Bellevue, WA 98004

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Certificate of Service

#10

(#10) MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at 206-370-8805 at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 4/14/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Filing Notice of Removal in Superior Court re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Rebecca Day, Swedish Medical Center (Markosova, Kristina) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#3

(#3) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Rebecca Day, Swedish Medical Center (Markosova, Kristina) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint; by Rebecca Day, Swedish Medical Center.(Markosova, Kristina) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-29138-9; (Receipt # 0981-6040484), filed by Swedish Medical Center, Rebecca Day. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(Markosova, Kristina) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2019: #3 Complaint) (SG). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) PRAECIPE to attach document (Complaint for Damages and Other Relief) re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Rebecca Day, Swedish Medical Center (Markosova, Kristina) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SG) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#8

(#8) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Shannon Anderson Saevik (Lonnquist, Judith) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Rebecca Day, Swedish Medical Center (Markosova, Kristina) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint; by Rebecca Day, Swedish Medical Center.(Markosova, Kristina) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at 206-370-8805 at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 4/14/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Shannon Anderson Saevik (Lonnquist, Judith) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRAECIPE to attach document (Complaint for Damages and Other Relief) re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Rebecca Day, Swedish Medical Center (Markosova, Kristina) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SG) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketU.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (SG) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Filing Notice of Removal in Superior Court re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Rebecca Day, Swedish Medical Center (Markosova, Kristina) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Rebecca Day, Swedish Medical Center (Markosova, Kristina) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Rebecca Day, Swedish Medical Center (Markosova, Kristina) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-29138-9; (Receipt # 0981-6040484), filed by Swedish Medical Center, Rebecca Day. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(Markosova, Kristina) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2019: #3 Complaint) (SG). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.