This case was last updated from PACER on 07/04/2019 at 11:03:46 (UTC).

Anderson Plumbing LLC v. Matthews International Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 Anderson Plumbing LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Matthews International Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Halil S. Ozerden and John C. Gargiulo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00257

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Halil S. Ozerden

Referral Judge

John C. Gargiulo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anderson Plumbing LLC

Defendants

Matthews International Corporation

Tate Michael Spaulding

Matthews Cremation Division

Matthews Environmental Solutions

John Does 1-8

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen W. Dummer

Attorney at DUMMER LAW GROUP, PLLC

770 Water Street

Biloxi, MS 39530

Defendant Attorney

Fredrick B. Feeney, II

Attorney at FRANKE & SALLOUM, PLLC

P. O. Drawer 460, 10071 Lorraine Road (39503)

Gulfport, MS 39502

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings for 30 days to allow parties time to finalize settlement agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 5/6/19 (HM) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Matthews International Corporation, Tate Michael Spaulding (Feeney, Fredrick) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Matthews Cremation Division, Matthews Environmental Solutions, Matthews International Corporation, Tate Michael Spaulding.(Feeney, Fredrick) Modified on 5/1/2019 to delete John Does 1-8 as a filer (RLW). (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#4

(#4) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Anderson Plumbing LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Agreed Order)(Dummer, Stephen) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#7

(#7) AGREED JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL: cause dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear their own costs. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 6/13/2019 (wld) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Agreed Order

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Matthews Cremation Division, Matthews Environmental Solutions, Matthews International Corporation, Tate Michael Spaulding (Feeney, Fredrick) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

1 #1

- Lower court pleadings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Matthews Cremation Division, Matthews Environmental Solutions, Matthews International Corporation, Tate Michael Spaulding from Jackson County Circuit Court, case number 2019-00,052(2). Lower court jury demand.(Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-3978438) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 - Lower court pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AGREED JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL: cause dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear their own costs. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 6/13/2019 (wld) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Matthews International Corporation, Tate Michael Spaulding (Feeney, Fredrick) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER suspending all deadlines for 30 days. The parties have informed the Court that this case has settled and have requested 30 days to finalize the settlement. The parties are directed to submit a proposed Final Judgment to Judge Ozerden's chambers, to file a Stipulation of Dismissal signed by all parties who have appeared, or to advise the Court that they consent to entry of the Court's standard Final Judgment, by 6/5/2019. Otherwise, after that date, the Court will enter its standard Final Judgment. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 5/6/2019 (HM) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings for 30 days to allow parties time to finalize settlement agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 5/6/19 (HM) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Docket Annotation as to Doc. #4. Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). (wld) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Anderson Plumbing LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Agreed Order)(Dummer, Stephen) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Matthews Cremation Division, Matthews Environmental Solutions, Matthews International Corporation, Tate Michael Spaulding (Feeney, Fredrick) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #2: Per attorney, John and Jane Does 1-8 were inadvertently selected as a filer. Court staff has revised docket entry. Also, incorrect event was chosen. The event Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) should have been used. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Matthews Cremation Division, Matthews Environmental Solutions, Matthews International Corporation, Tate Michael Spaulding.(Feeney, Fredrick) Modified on 5/1/2019 to delete John Does 1-8 as a filer (RLW). (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Matthews Cremation Division, Matthews Environmental Solutions, Matthews International Corporation, Tate Michael Spaulding from Jackson County Circuit Court, case number 2019-00,052(2). Lower court jury demand.(Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-3978438) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 - Lower court pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.