This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2019 at 07:19:48 (UTC).

ANDERSON HOSPITAL et al v. AZAR

Case Summary

On 05/14/2019 ANDERSON HOSPITAL filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against AZAR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is John D. Bates. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01386

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John D. Bates

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HENRY COUNTY HEALTH

BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER - EAST CAMPUS

HOLY FAMILY MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER

FRANCISCAN ST. FRANCIS HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS

GREAT RIVER MEDICAL CENTER

CAPE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

MHP HOSPITAL

ASPIRUS RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL

CARONDELET HEART & VASCULAR INSTITUTE

HOLLAND HOSPITAL

FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER - MAIN CAMPUS

GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL

PRINCETON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

ASCENSION PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL, SOUTHFIELD CAMPUS

MARIETTA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL

ASCENSION RIVER DISTRICT HOSPITAL

ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL

Defendant

ALEX M. AZAR, II

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

N. Kent Smith

Attorney at HALL RENDER KILLIAN HEALTH & LYMAN, P.C.

500 North Meridian Street, Suite 400

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1293

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/7/2019. (jth) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by not later than August 7, 2019, that includes: (i) whether the government has moved to consolidate this case with other cases; (ii) a detailed explanation of the parties' positions on whether consolidation of this case is appropriate; and (iii) if the case is not consolidated, what proceedings, if any, are appropriate in this case in light of the Supreme Court's decision in Azar v. Allina Health Servs., 139 S. Ct. 1804 (2019). It is further ORDERED that this case shall be STAYED until further order of this Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/8/2019. (lcjdb2) Modified on 7/8/2019 (lcjdb2). (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/23/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Green Card, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Smith, N.) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Green Card, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Smith, N.) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 5/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Green Card, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Smith, N.) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANDERSON HOSPITAL, ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL, SOUTHFIELD CAMPUS, ASCENSION RIVER DISTRICT HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SETON MEDICAL CENTER AUSTIN, ASPIRUS RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL, AULTMAN HOSPITAL, BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER - EAST CAMPUS, CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CAPE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL, CARONDELET HEART & VASCULAR INSTITUTE, CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER LONGVIEW, CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CONWAY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, EAST ALABAMA MEDICAL CENTER, EVANGELICAL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, FAIRFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER - MAIN CAMPUS, FITZGIBBON HOSPITAL, FLUSHING HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, FRANCISCAN HEALTH MICHIGAN CITY, FRANCISCAN HEALTH OLYMPIA FIELDS CAMPUS, FRANCISCAN ST. FRANCIS HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, FREEMAN WEST, FROEDTERT & MEDICAL COLLEGE OF WISCONSIN, GENEVA GENERAL HOSPITAL, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, GREAT RIVER MEDICAL CENTER, GWINNETT MEDICAL CENTER - LAWRENCEVILLE, HANCOCK REGIONAL HOSPITAL, HENDRICKS REGIONAL HEALTH DANVILLE, HENRY COUNTY HEALTH, HOLLAND HOSPITAL, HOLY FAMILY MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, IREDELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, IU HEALTH METHODIST UNIVERSITY, KARMANOS CANCER CENTER, MARIETTA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MARION GENERAL HOSPITAL, MAYO CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM IN EAU CLAIRE, MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE, METHODIST HOSPITAL, MHP HOSPITAL, MOUNT SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CENTER, NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, NORTH GEORGIA MEDICAL CENTER, PARKLAND HOSPITAL, PLEASANT VALLEY HOSPITAL, PRINCETON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL (Smith, N.) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 17-1484. (Smith, N.) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by N. Kent Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, N.) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT UNDER THE MEDICARE ACT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6122417) filed by HANCOCK REGIONAL HOSPITAL, GWINNETT MEDICAL CENTER - LAWRENCEVILLE, FITZGIBBON HOSPITAL, ASPIRUS RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL, FREEMAN WEST, EAST ALABAMA MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL, ANDERSON HOSPITAL, EVANGELICAL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, CONWAY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE, FROEDTERT & MEDICAL COLLEGE OF WISCONSIN, FRANCISCAN ST. FRANCIS HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, GENEVA GENERAL HOSPITAL, KARMANOS CANCER CENTER, FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER - MAIN CAMPUS, CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER LONGVIEW, NORTH GEORGIA MEDICAL CENTER, FRANCISCAN HEALTH MICHIGAN CITY, CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GREAT RIVER MEDICAL CENTER, HENRY COUNTY HEALTH, CAPE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL, NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MARION GENERAL HOSPITAL, FLUSHING HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, MHP HOSPITAL, CARONDELET HEART & VASCULAR INSTITUTE, FRANCISCAN HEALTH OLYMPIA FIELDS CAMPUS, ASCENSION SETON MEDICAL CENTER AUSTIN, PARKLAND HOSPITAL, IU HEALTH METHODIST UNIVERSITY, HOLLAND HOSPITAL, ASCENSION PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL, SOUTHFIELD CAMPUS, PLEASANT VALLEY HOSPITAL, BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER - EAST CAMPUS, MARIETTA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL, MOUNT SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CENTER, CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, PRINCETON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, IREDELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, AULTMAN HOSPITAL, ASCENSION RIVER DISTRICT HOSPITAL, HENDRICKS REGIONAL HEALTH DANVILLE, METHODIST HOSPITAL, HOLY FAMILY MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, MAYO CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM IN EAU CLAIRE, FAIRFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Alex Azar, #3 Summons to Jessie Liu, #4 Summons to William Barr)(Smith, N.) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER - EAST CAMPUS is a litigant

Latest cases where Princeton Community Hospital is a litigant

Latest cases where ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Firelands Regional Medical Center is a litigant