This case was last updated from PACER on 08/31/2021 at 09:34:32 (UTC).

ANDERSON et al v. RASIER, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 ANDERSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RASIER, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Katharine S. Hayden and Andre M. Espinosa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-13318

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katharine S. Hayden

Referral Judge

Andre M. Espinosa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESTATE OF JOYCE ANDERSON

JOYCE ANDERSON

MICHAEL ANDERSON AS ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF JOYCE ANDERSON AND AS ADMINISTRATOR AD PROSEQUENDUM ON BEHALF OF THE HEIRS-AT-LAW OF JOYCE ANDERSON

MICHAEL ANDERSON INDIVIDUALLY

MICHAEL ANDERSON

Defendants

HESHAM A HAGGAG

JOHN DOE 1-10 (said names being fictitious for persons and entities unknown at this time)

RASIER, LLC

1455 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94103

ABC CORP 1-10 (said names being fictitious for persons and entities unknown at this time)

JOHN DOE 1-10

ABC CORP 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAFFI T. KHOROZIAN

Attorney at ASLANIAN & KHOROZIAN, L.L.C.

1047 Anderson Avenue

Fort Lee, NJ 07024

Defendant Attorney

TEAGAN SARAH ALLEN

Attorney at GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP

1037 Raymond Boulevard, Suite 1010

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference for 9/15/2021 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 7/12/2021. (spc) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#3

(#3) Exhibit to QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44,, #1 Notice of Removal by RASIER, LLC. (ALLEN, TEAGAN) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by RASIER, LLC. (ALLEN, TEAGAN) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RASIER, LLC from ESSEX SUPERIOR COURT, case number ESX-L-5037-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12602862), filed by RASIER, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(ALLEN, TEAGAN) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference for 9/15/2021 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 7/12/2021. (spc) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Exhibit to QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44,, #1 Notice of Removal by RASIER, LLC. (ALLEN, TEAGAN) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jc, ) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, ) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (ak, ) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by RASIER, LLC. (ALLEN, TEAGAN) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RASIER, LLC from ESSEX SUPERIOR COURT, case number ESX-L-5037-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12602862), filed by RASIER, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(ALLEN, TEAGAN) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant