This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/05/2020 at 09:18:49 (UTC).

Anderson et al v. Raffensperger et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 Anderson filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Raffensperger. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael L. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03263

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sara Alami

Defendants

Thomas Mahoney, III

Wandy Taylor

David C. Fedack

Baoky N. Vu

Rebecca N. Sullivan

David J. Worley

Dele Lowman Smith

Diane Givens

Matthew Mashburn

Rinda Wilson

Samuel E. Tillman

Stephen Day

Aaron Johnson

Robert Proctor

Anthony Lewis

Neera Bahl

John Mangano

Brad Raffensperger

Antwan Lang

35 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacki Lynn Anderson

Attorney at Perkins Coie-DC

Suite 600, 700 Thirteenth St., N.W.

Washington, DC 20005-2011

Joyce Gist Lewis

Attorney at Krevolin & Horst, LLC

1201 W. Peachtree Street, Nw, Suite 3250

Atlanta, GA 30309

Kevin J. Hamilton

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Marc E. Elias

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

700 13Th St Nw, Ste 800

Washington, DC 20005

Amanda R. Callais

Attorney at Perkins Coie-DC

Suite 600, 700 Thirteenth St., N.W.

Washington, DC 20005-2011

Halsey G. Knapp, Jr

Attorney at Krevolin & Horst, LLC

One Atlantic Center, Ste 3250, 1201 West Peachtree St., Nw

Atlanta, GA 30309

Adam Martin Sparks

Attorney at Krevolin & Horst, LLC

One Atlantic Center, Ste 3250, 1201 West Peachtree St., Nw

Atlanta, GA 30309

Amanda J. Beane

Attorney at Perkins Coie-WA

1201 Third Avenue, 48Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Heath Loring Hyatt

Attorney at Perkins Coie

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorneys

Ralph Jonathan Hart

P.O. Box 8161

Savannah, GA 31412

Bryan Francis Jacoutot

Attorney at Taylor English Duma LLP

Suite 200, 1600 Parkwood Circle

Atlanta, GA 30339

Bryan P. Tyson

Attorney at Taylor English Duma LLP

Suite 200, 1600 Parkwood Circle

Atlanta, GA 30339

Timothy M. Boughey

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP -Atl

Suite 1600, 100 Galleria Parkway

Atlanta, GA 30339-5948

Charlene S McGowan

Attorney at Georgia Attorney General's Office

40 Capitol Square Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

Brian Edward Lake

Attorney at Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, LLC -Atl

500 Fourteenth St., N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30318

Carey Allen Miller

Attorney at Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, LLC -Atl

500 Fourteenth St., N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30318

William H. Noland

Attorney at Noland Law Firm, LLC

5400 Riverside Drive, Ste 205

Macon, GA 31210

Cheryl Ringer

Attorney at Office of Fulton County Attorney

Suite 4038, 141 Pryor Street, S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30303

David R. Lowman

Attorney at Fulton County Attorney's Office

Suite 4038, 141 Pryor St., S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30303

Other Attorneys

Marcus Aaron Haggard

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - CO

1900 16Th Street

Denver, CO 80202

25 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#135

134 #4

Exhibit

134 #3

Exhibit

134 #2

Exhibit

134 #1

Exhibit

#134

133 #1

Exhibit A (Planned Henry County Voter Equipment Allocation for November 2020 Ele

#133

#125

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

310 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#135) NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Leigh Johnson on behalf of Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Johnson, Melanie) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#134) NOTICE Of Filing by Mary Carole Cooney, Aaron Johnson, Vernetta Nuriddin, Mark Wingate re #125 Order,,,, CORRECTED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Thomas, Detriss) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#133) NOTICE Of Filing of Voter Equipment Allocation Information by Henry County Board of Elections and Registration Defendants by Arch Brown, Andy Callaway, Donna Crumbley, Donna Morris-McBride, Mildred Schmelz re #125 Order,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Planned Henry County Voter Equipment Allocation for November 2020 Election))(Robin, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#132) NOTICE Of Filing VOTING EQUIPMENT ALLOCATION INFORMATION by David C. Fedack, Myesha Good, Maurice Hurry, Robert Proctor, Daniel Zimmermann (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Douglas Countys allocations for the June 9, 2020 primary election, #2 Exhibit B: Douglas Countys allocations by precinct for the upcoming November 2, 2020 general election, #3 Exhibit C: Douglas County voters per voting precinct, #4 Exhibit D: Initial analysis of previous and upcoming election data regarding allocations)(Boughey, Timothy) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#131) NOTICE Of Filing by Diane Givens, Dorothy Foster Hall, Darlene Johnson, Patricia Pullar, Carol Wesley re #125 Order,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Current Clayton County Polling Place Voting Equipment Allocation Report, #2 Exhibit Worksheet for ballot marking devices for June 2020 primary)(Sabzevari, Arash) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#130) NOTICE Of Filing by Mary Carole Cooney, Aaron Johnson, Vernetta Nuriddin, Mark Wingate re #125 Order,,,, (Thomas, Detriss) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Edward Lake on behalf of Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Lake, Brian) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) NOTICE Of Filing Declarations by Henry Ficklin, Mike Kaplan, Cassandra Powell, Herbert Spangler, Rinda Wilson (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeanetta Watson, #2 Exhibit June 9 Allocation, #3 Exhibit November 3 Allocation)(Noland, William) Modified on 10/2/2020 (dob). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits by Anthony Lewis, Susan Motter, Dele Lowman Smith, Samuel E. Tillman, Baoky N. Vu (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2)(Momo, Shelley) Modified on 10/2/2020 to add text to reflect PDF (dob). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) NOTICE Of Filing Voting Equipment Allocation Information by Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield, Wandy Taylor re #125 Order,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Equipment allocation for November 2020, #2 Exhibit B - Equipment allocation for June 2020, #3 Exhibit C - Active registered voters by precinct)(Jacoutot, Bryan) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
132 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Electronic Summons Issued as to Stephen Day. (adg) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Electronic Summons Issued as to Mary Carole Cooney. (adg) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Electronic Summons Issued as to Andy Callaway. (adg) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Electronic Summons Issued as to Arch Brown. (adg) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Jessica M. Brooks. (adg) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Neera Bahl. (adg) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Fred Aiken. (adg) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNotification of Docket Correction :Anthony Lewis party info correction (adg) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Leigh Martin May recused. Case reassigned to Judge Michael L. Brown for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:20-cv-3263-MLB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 8/6/2020. (adg) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., Gianella Contreras Chavez, Lucille Anderson, DSCC, Sara Alami.(Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9998713) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less