This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/05/2020 at 10:12:39 (UTC).

Anderson et al v. Apple Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2020 Anderson filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Apple Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02328

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Elaine Anderson

Erik Villagran

Scott Burst

Jacqueline Demeritte

Colea Childs

Beth Chavez

Euihwan Cho

Donald Dahl

Alison Coleman

Victoria Cornwell

Scott Sapkosky

Diana Atkins

Candace Martino

Simone Cox

Beth Tomson

Deborah Morgan

Denice Ryan

Travis Rea

James Hines

Defendant

Apple Inc.

47 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shana E. Scarlett

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

715 Hearst Avenue, Suite 202

Berkeley, CA 94710

Ben Michael Harrington

Attorney at Hagens Berman

715 Hearst Avenue, Suite 200

Berkeley, CA 94710

Steve W. Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1301 Second Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Thomas Eric Loeser

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1301 2Nd Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorneys

Sabrina Larson

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster, LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Arturo J. Gonzalez

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Tiffany Cheung

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

21 #2

Proposed Order

10 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

7 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Declaration of Zachary Ethan Schwarz in Support of #23 Amended Complaint,,,, (DECLARATION RE CLRA VENUE) filed byZachary Schwartz. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/28/2020) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Declaration of Sheila Claxton in Support of #23 Amended Complaint,,,, (DECLARATION RE CLRA VENUE) filed bySheila Claxton. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/28/2020) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Declaration of Oskar Villagomez in Support of #23 Amended Complaint,,,, (DECLARATION RE CLRA VENUE) filed byOskar Villagomez. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/28/2020) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Declaration of Kyle Kristoff in Support of #23 Amended Complaint,,,, (DECLARATION RE CLRA VENUE) filed byKyle Kristoff. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/28/2020) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Declaration of Euihwan Cho in Support of #23 Amended Complaint,,,, (DECLARATION RE CLRA VENUE) filed byEuihwan Cho. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/28/2020) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Declaration of Diana Atkins in Support of #23 Amended Complaint,,,, (DECLARATION RE CLRA VENUE) filed byDiana Atkins. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/28/2020) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc.. Filed byAlison Coleman, Jacqueline Demeritte, Candace Martino, Scott Sapkosky, Diana Atkins, Elaine Anderson, Erik Villagran, Euihwan Cho, Scott Burst, Donald Dahl, Victoria Cornwell, Beth Chavez, Colea Childs, Rhonda Mason, Daniel Aviles, Crystal Miller, Taylor Chanek, Matt Taylor, Bernadette Lionetta, Melissa Arellano, Kyle Kristoff, Pamela Vohringer, Michael Miller, Randall Knight, Christopher Adams, Kimberly Walker, Zachary Schwartz, Latecia Cushion Knight, Cuneyit Adiguzel, Jeffrey Messina, Bryan Riviello, Jabre Wise, Veronica Stovall, Rodney Weber, Christian Hunt, Simone Cox, Melanie Cobb, Nancy Prater, Sheila Claxton, Chasidy Dawson, David Kreamer, Beth Tomson, Melissa Lynn Brevig, Marlena Harrison, Wendy Sorrells, Timothy Downs, Deborah Morgan, Yvette Knox, Julie Rambousek, Denice Ryan, James Hines, Raven Shaw, Nicole Prichard, James Matos, Travis Rea, Oskar Villagomez, Mercedes Espinoza, Jennifer Pratt, Merlyn Johnson, Regina Ellison, Andrew Bewick, Robert Altmann, Lesley Villa, Cherie Brown, Pamela Paine, Nina Parker. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/28/2020) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #21 Administrative Motion Consider Whether Cases Should be Related. Case No. 5:20-cv-3102-NC is found to be related to this matter. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Elaine Anderson, Diana Atkins, Scott Burst, Beth Chavez, Colea Childs, Euihwan Cho, Alison Coleman, Victoria Cornwell, Donald Dahl, Jacqueline Demeritte, Candace Martino, Scott Sapkosky, Erik Villagran. Responses due by 5/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation in Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, #2 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #19 Stipulation. Case Management Conference continued to 9/15/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2020) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings., Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 04/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • Docket(#9) This case will be randomly assigned/reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14357826.) filed by Elaine Anderson, Diana Atkins, Scott Burst, Beth Chavez, Colea Childs, Euihwan Cho, Alison Coleman, Victoria Cornwell, Donald Dahl, Jacqueline Demeritte, Candace Martino, Scott Sapkosky, Erik Villagran. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/9/2020) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elaine Anderson, Diana Atkins, Scott Burst, Beth Chavez, Colea Childs, Euihwan Cho, Alison Coleman, Victoria Cornwell, Donald Dahl, Jacqueline Demeritte, Candace Martino, Scott Sapkosky, Erik Villagran.. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 4/9/2020) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/21/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 4/6/2020) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14346872.). Filed byEuihwan Cho, Candace Martino, Scott Burst, Alison Coleman, Donald Dahl, Scott Sapkosky, Diana Atkins, Victoria Cornwell, Elaine Anderson, Beth Chavez, Erik Villagran, Jacqueline Demeritte, Colea Childs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 4/6/2020) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sabrina Larson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Arturo Jorge Gonzalez Esquire

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tiffany Cheung