This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2023 at 15:36:02 (UTC).

Andersen et al v. Stability AI Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On January 13, 2023, Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, and Karla Ortiz (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, represented by Joseph R. Saveri of Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP, filed a class action lawsuit against Stability AI Ltd. and Stability AI, Inc. (collectively “Stability”); Midjourney, Inc. (“Midjourney”); and DeviantArt, Inc. (“DeviantArt”) (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking injunctive relief, declaratory judgment, and compensatory damages for alleged direct and vicarious copyright infringement, violation of Plaintiffs’ statutory and common law rights of publicity, and violation of California’s Unfair Competition Law. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California, with Judge Joseph C. Spero presiding.

In the complaint, the plaintiffs stated, “Stable Diffusion is software released under a permissive open-source license. Under this open-source license, programmers and users can download for free the software and its associated machine-learning models derived from the Training Images and then use the software according to the terms of the open-source license.”

The plaintiffs alleged that “Defendants had access to but were not licensed by Plaintiffs or the Class to train any machine learning, AI, or other computer program, algorithm, or other functional prediction engine using the Works. Defendants had access to but were not licensed by Plaintiffs nor the Class to incorporate the Works into the products offered by Stability, DeviantArt, Midjourney, or related software applications.”

Plaintiffs further alleged, “DeviantArt has not attempted to negotiate licenses for any of the Training Images. Like Stability, DeviantArt is not sharing any of the revenue from the DreamUp app with the artists or other owners of the Training Images. DeviantArt has betrayed its artist community. Rather than standing up for the rights of its members by rejecting Stable Diffusion and other sources of AI-generated art, DeviantArt has gone the opposite direction: it has built an app called DreamUp that is based on Stable Diffusion. By releasing DreamUp as a paid product, DeviantArt is a co-conspirator in the illegal use of copyrighted works.”

Additionally, the plaintiffs alleged, “Individuals have used AI Image Products to create works using the names of Plaintiffs and the Class in prompts and passed those works off as original works by the artist whose name was used in the prompt. Such individuals are referred to herein as ‘Imposters.’ By using a particular artist’s name, Imposters can cause the AI Image Product to rely more heavily on that artist’s prior works to create images that can pass as original works by that artist. These output images are referred to herein as ‘Fakes.’”

Plaintiffs presented seven claims for relief, including for alleged direct and vicarious copyright infringement, violation of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act, violation of the statutory right of publicity, and violation of California’s Unfair Competition Law.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiffs requested a judgment for injunctive relief against further alleged violations and award of compensatory damages together with costs of litigation.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00201

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sarah Andersen

Kelly McKernan

Karla Ortiz

Defendants

Stability AI Ltd.

Stability AI, Inc.

Midjourney, Inc.

DeviantArt, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian D Clark

Cadio R. Zirpoli

Christopher Kar-Lun Young

Elissa Amlin Buchanan

Eura Chang

Matthew Butterick

Laura Matson

Travis Luke Manfredi

Joseph R. Saveri

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Alan Lemley

Nicole Marie Jantzi

Paul M. Schoenhard

Amir Ghavi

Michael Courtney Keats

Judd D. Lauter

Kayla Elizabeth Blaker

James Asheton Lemay

Angela Lucille Dunning

Michael H. Rubin

Andrew Michael Gass

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#48

(#48) Certificate of Interested Entities by Midjourney, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate David Holz for Midjourney, Inc.. (Lauter, Judd) (Filed on 2/23/2023) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#47

(#47) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midjourney, Inc. (Lauter, Judd) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

#46

(#46) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Paul M. Schoenbard. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#45

(#45) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Laura M. Matson. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#44

(#44) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Michael C. Keats. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#30

(#45) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Laura M. Matson. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#15

(#44) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Michael C. Keats. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#13

(#43) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Nicole M. Jantzi. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#12

(#46) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Paul M. Schoenbard. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

1 #17

Exhibit 17

1 #16

Exhibit 16

1 #14

Exhibit 14

1 #11

Exhibit 11

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #4

Exhibit 4

53 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

02/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#48) Certificate of Interested Entities by Midjourney, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate David Holz for Midjourney, Inc.. (Lauter, Judd) (Filed on 2/23/2023) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#47) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midjourney, Inc. (Lauter, Judd) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#46) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Paul M. Schoenbard. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#45) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Laura M. Matson. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#44) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Michael C. Keats. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#43) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Nicole M. Jantzi. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#42) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Amir R. Ghavi. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#41) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Kayla Blaker. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#40) ORDER REGARDING DEVIANTART, INC.'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND RELATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge William H. Orrick granting #39 Stipulation. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#39) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding DeviantArt Inc.'s Deadline to Respond to Complaint and Related Briefing Schedule filed by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz, DeviantArt, Inc. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/8/2023) Modified on 2/8/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
View All Docket Entries
01/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sarah Andersen.. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/27/2023) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/20/2023) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Andersen, Karla Ortiz, Kelly McKernan. Midjourney, Inc. served on 1/18/2023, answer due 2/8/2023. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/20/2023) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Andersen, Karla Ortiz, Kelly McKernan. DeviantArt, Inc. served on 1/18/2023, answer due 2/8/2023. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/19/2023) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Andersen, Karla Ortiz, Kelly McKernan. Stability AI, Inc. served on 1/18/2023, answer due 2/8/2023. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/19/2023) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2023) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to DeviantArt, Inc., Midjourney, Inc., Stability AI Ltd., Stability AI, Inc.. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2023) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/31/2023. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2023) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/13/2023) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17900289.). Filed by Sarah Andersen, Karla Ortiz, Kelly McKernan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/13/2023) Modified on 1/17/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less