This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2020 at 07:02:41 (UTC).

ANDERS v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 ANDERS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JUUL LABS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-06653

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS ANDERS

Defendants

McLane Company, Inc.

James Monsees

Philip Morris USA Inc

Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc.

Altria Client Services LLC

Riaz Valani

Adam Bowen

Eliquitech Inc

Altria Group Distribution Company

Juul Labs Inc. doing business as Pax Labs Inc doing business as Ploom Inc.

Altria Group Inc.

Eby-Brown Company, LLC

Alternative Ingredients Inc

Nicholas Pritzker

Altria Enterprises LLC

MOTHER MURPHY'S LABS, INC.

Hoyoung Huh

Tobacco Technology, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeff S. Gibson

Attorney at Wagner Reese, LLP

11939 North Meridian Street

Carmel, IN 46032

Christopher G. Paulos

Attorney at Levin Papantonio Thomas Mitchell Rafferty & Proctor, P.A

316 South Baylen Street, Suite 600

Pensacola, FL 32502

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) AMENDED SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (PERSONAL INJURY) against All Defendants. Filed by THOMAS ANDERS. (Paulos, Christopher) (Filed on 11/14/2020) (Entered: 11/14/2020)

9 #1

*Restricted*

#9

(#9) Case Transferred in from United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana (Indianapolis); Case Number 1:20-cv-02341-TWP-DML. Original File, Certified Copy of Transfer Order and Docket Sheet Received. (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#8

(#8) Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of California. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of California, IN RE: MDL 2913 on September 21, 2020. (MAC) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#7

(#7) CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District for the Northern District of California IN RE: MDL 2913, JUUL LABS, INC., MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION, CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER #40. (MAC) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#6

(#6) ENTRY ON JURISDICTION - As the party asking this Court to invoke its jurisdiction, Plaintiff must properly allege the citizenship of each of the parties to establish subject matter jurisdiction. Therefore, the Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement that establishes the Court's jurisdiction over this case. This statement should specifically identify the citizenship of the parties. This jurisdictional statement is due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Entry. (See Entry.) Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/14/2020.(NAD) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to ALTERNATIVE INGREDIENTS, INC., ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES LLC, ALTRIA ENTERPRISES LLC, ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., ADAM BOWEN, CORE-MARK HOLDING COMPANY, INC., EBY-BROWN COMPANY, LLC, ELIQUITECH, INC., HOYOUNG HUH, JUUL LABS, INC., MCLANE COMPANY, INC., JAMES MONSEES, MOTHER MURPHY'S LABS, INC., PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC., NICHOLAS PRITZKER, TOBACCO TECHNOLOGY, INC., RIAZ VALANI. (NAD) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to All Defendants. (Gibson, Jeff) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff S. Gibson on behalf of Plaintiff THOMAS ANDERS. (Gibson, Jeff) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Proposed Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by THOMAS ANDERS - (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0756-6170849) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gibson, Jeff) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (PERSONAL INJURY) against All Defendants. Filed by THOMAS ANDERS. (Paulos, Christopher) (Filed on 11/14/2020) (Entered: 11/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED re 3:19-md-02913-WHO: USDC, Southern District of Indiana (Indianapolis), 1:20-cv-02341-TWP-DML, THOMAS ANDERS V. JUUL LABS, INC., ET AL, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-06653-WHO pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order (CTO - 40) cc: JPMDL (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2020) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Case Transferred in from United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana (Indianapolis); Case Number 1:20-cv-02341-TWP-DML. Original File, Certified Copy of Transfer Order and Docket Sheet Received. (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of California. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of California, IN RE: MDL 2913 on September 21, 2020. (MAC) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District for the Northern District of California IN RE: MDL 2913, JUUL LABS, INC., MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION, CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER #40. (MAC) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY ON JURISDICTION - As the party asking this Court to invoke its jurisdiction, Plaintiff must properly allege the citizenship of each of the parties to establish subject matter jurisdiction. Therefore, the Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement that establishes the Court's jurisdiction over this case. This statement should specifically identify the citizenship of the parties. This jurisdictional statement is due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Entry. (See Entry.) Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/14/2020.(NAD) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to ALTERNATIVE INGREDIENTS, INC., ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES LLC, ALTRIA ENTERPRISES LLC, ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., ADAM BOWEN, CORE-MARK HOLDING COMPANY, INC., EBY-BROWN COMPANY, LLC, ELIQUITECH, INC., HOYOUNG HUH, JUUL LABS, INC., MCLANE COMPANY, INC., JAMES MONSEES, MOTHER MURPHY'S LABS, INC., PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC., NICHOLAS PRITZKER, TOBACCO TECHNOLOGY, INC., RIAZ VALANI. (NAD) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to All Defendants. (Gibson, Jeff) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff S. Gibson on behalf of Plaintiff THOMAS ANDERS. (Gibson, Jeff) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by THOMAS ANDERS - (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0756-6170849) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gibson, Jeff) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUUL Labs, Inc. doing business as PAX Labs, Inc. doing business as Ploom, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc. is a litigant