This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/26/2019 at 08:09:42 (UTC).

Ancora Technologies, Inc. v. TCL Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2019 Ancora Technologies, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against TCL Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00624

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ancora Technologies, Inc.

Defendants

TCL Communication Technology Holdings Ltd.

TCL Communication Holdings Ltd.

TCL Communication Ltd.

TCL Corp.

TCT Mobile (US) Holdings Inc.

TCT Mobile International Limited

TCT Mobile, Inc.

TCT Mobile (US) Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth Siebman Forrest

Attorney at Siebman Forrest Burg & Smith LLP - Sherman

300 N Travis St

Sherman, TX 75090-0070

Clyde Moody Siebman

Attorney at Siebman Forrest Burg & Smith LLP - Sherman

300 N Travis St

Sherman, TX 75090-0070

Marc Lorelli

Attorney at Brooks & Kushman PC - Southfield

1000 Town Center, 22Nd Floor

Southfield, MI 48075

Jeffrey Jack Burley

Attorney at Siebman Forrest Burg & Smith LLP - Sherman

300 N Travis St

Sherman, TX 75090-0070

John P Rondini

Attorney at Brooks Kushman, PC

1000 Town Center, 22Nd Floor

Southfield, MI 48075

Mark A Cantor

Attorney at Brooks & Kushman PC - Southfield

1000 Town Center, 22Nd Floor

Southfield, MI 48075

John S Le Roy

Attorney at Brooks & Kushman PC - Southfield

1000 Town Center, 22Nd Floor

Southfield, MI 48075

Defendant Attorneys

John P Schnurer

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - San Diego

11452 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130-2080

Kyle Ryan Canavera

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - San Diego

11452 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130-2080

 

Court Documents

#25

#24

23 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#23

#22

#21

#20

12 #2

Exhibit B - Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate

#12

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle Ryan Canavera on behalf of TCL Communication Ltd., TCL Communication Technology Holdings Ltd., TCL Corp., TCT Mobile International Limited (Canavera, Kyle) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Answer Due Deadline Updated for All Defendants to 2/4/2020. (rpc, ) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER granting #23 Motion to Extend Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement. All Defendants are hereby ordered to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. #12 ) no later than February 4, 2020. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/18/2019. (rpc, ) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement by TCL Communication Holdings Ltd., TCL Communication Ltd., TCL Communication Technology Holdings Ltd., TCL Corp., TCT Mobile (US) Holdings Inc., TCT Mobile (US) Inc., TCT Mobile International Limited, TCT Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnurer, John) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for TCT Mobile, Inc. to 11/6/2019; TCT Mobile (US) Holdings Inc. to 11/6/2019; TCT Mobile (US) Inc. to 11/6/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Defendants' Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re TCT Mobile (US) Holdings Inc., TCT Mobile (US) Inc., and TCT Mobile, Inc.( Canavera, Kyle) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Jack Burley on behalf of Ancora Technologies, Inc. (Burley, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ancora Technologies, Inc.. TCT Mobile, Inc. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Lorelli, Marc) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ancora Technologies, Inc.. TCT Mobile (US) Inc. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Lorelli, Marc) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ancora Technologies, Inc.. TCT Mobile (US) Holdings Inc. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Lorelli, Marc) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark A Cantor on behalf of Ancora Technologies, Inc. (Cantor, Mark) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Issued as to TCL Corp. (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued as to TCL Communication Technology Holdings Ltd. (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued as to TCL Communication Ltd. (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued as to TCL Communication Holdings Ltd. (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Additional Attachments to Main Document - Civil Coversheet: #1 Complaint. (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against TCL Communication Holdings Ltd., TCL Communication Ltd., TCL Communication Technology Holdings Ltd., TCL Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7411281.), filed by Ancora Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ancora Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TCL Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where TCL COMMUNICATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TCL Communication Technology Holdings LTD is a litigant