Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2020 at 14:11:37 (UTC).

Mary Ramos v Anco Insulations, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 Mary Ramos filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Anco Insulations, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nannette Jolivette Brown and Michael North. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01208

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nannette Jolivette Brown

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Not Classified By Court

Edward L. Diefenthal

Grefco, Inc.

Hopeman Brothers, Inc.

General Electric Company

Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.

CBS Corporation

Maryland Casualty Company

Certain-Teed Corporation

Charles Johnson

Ingersoll-Rand Company

James R. Diefenthal

Cheramie Marine LLC

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Defendant, Cross Claimant and Not Classified By Court

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Not Classified By Court, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

Central Gulf Towing LLC

Edward L. Diefenthal

Grefco, Inc.

Hopeman Brothers, Inc.

The McCarty Corporation

General Electric Company

Crane Co.

Warren Pumps, L.L.C.

Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.

John Crane, Inc.

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.

CBS Corporation

Maryland Casualty Company

Certain-Teed Corporation

Charles Johnson

Ingersoll-Rand Company

James R. Diefenthal

Fidelity and Casual Insurance Company of New York

Cheramie Marine LLC

91 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Kelly L. Long

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3800

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

James H. Brown, Jr.

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3800

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Angela M. Bowlin

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3800

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3800

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Lacey Taylor McCoy

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3800

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Kelsey A. Eagan

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3800

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Magali Ann Puente-Martin

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3800

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Gustave A. Fritchie, III

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Alexander R Saunders

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Timothy Farrow Daniels

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael Kevin Powell

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Edward Winter Trapolin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Gustave A. Fritchie, III

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Alexander R Saunders

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Timothy Farrow Daniels

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael Kevin Powell

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Edward Winter Trapolin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Other Attorneys

Scott Michael Galante

Attorney at Galante & Bivalacqua LLC

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2615

New Orleans, LA 70130

Damon R. Pourciau

Attorney at Ardoin Law Firm

2200 Veterans Memorial Blvd., Suite 210

Kenner, LA 70062

Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.

Attorney at Kean Miller, LLP (Baton Rouge)

400 Convention St., Suite 700, Po Box 3513 (70821-3513)

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Stephanie Moore Hartman

Attorney at Galante & Bivalacqua LLC

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2615

New Orleans, LA 70130

Patrick Dale Roquemore

Attorney at Kean Miller, LLP (Baton Rouge)

400 Convention St., Suite 700, Po Box 3513 (70821-3513)

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Remand Letter

#11

(#11) ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT - ORDERED that the parties' #7 Joint Motion to Remand Proceedings to State Court is GRANTED and the case is REMANDED to the Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, State of Louisiana. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Foster Wheeler's #6 Joinder in GE's Notice of Removal is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/4/19. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter)(sbs) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#10

(#10) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Jalenak, Jay) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#9

(#9) Application for Refund of Electronic Fees filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation for the following reason: Duplicate filing fee; receipt number 053L-7417633. (Long, Kelly) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by Mary Ramos Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galante, Scott) Modified filers on 2/20/2019 (mm). (Entered: 02/19/2019)

6 #6

Proposed Order

6 #5

Exhibit E

6 #4

Exhibit D

6 #3

Exhibit C

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Joinder in Removal by Foster Wheeler Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Long, Kelly) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

1 #14

Exhibit L

1 #11

Exhibit I

1 #10

Exhibit H

1 #8

Exhibit F

1 #7

Exhibit E

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT - ORDERED that the parties' #7 Joint Motion to Remand Proceedings to State Court is GRANTED and the case is REMANDED to the Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, State of Louisiana. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Foster Wheeler's #6 Joinder in GE's Notice of Removal is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/4/19. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter)(sbs) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Jalenak, Jay) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Application for Refund of Electronic Fees filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation for the following reason: Duplicate filing fee; receipt number 053L-7417633. (Long, Kelly) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court. **1. Document does not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section G and Magistrate (5). 2. Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s).** (mm) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by Mary Ramos Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galante, Scott) Modified filers on 2/20/2019 (mm). (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Joinder in Removal by Foster Wheeler Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Long, Kelly) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by General Electric Company. By the Clerk. (mm) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Notice of Removal; Document filed in error. Notice of Removal is an initiating case pleading and should not be filed by separate parties within the same case. (lag) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FILED IN ERROR: NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2018-5054 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7417633) filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A to Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Kelly L. Long added to party Foster Wheeler Corporation(pty:selreq).(Long, Kelly) Modified on 2/11/2019 (lag). (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 18-05054 D-12 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7417089) filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleading, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N) Attorney Kelly L. Long added to party General Electric Company(pty:def).(Long, Kelly) Modified text on 2/11/2019 (mm). (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Grefco, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Maryland Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where McCarty Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated is a litigant