This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2019 at 10:45:27 (UTC).

Anaya v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 Anaya filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jerry H. Ritter and Steven C. Yarbrough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00355

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jerry H. Ritter

Presiding Judge

Steven C. Yarbrough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lupe Anaya

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Matthew Fine

Attorney at Fine Law Firm

220 Ninth Street, Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Charlotte Itoh

Attorney at Fine Law Firm

220 9Th St. Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

Todd Schwarz

Attorney at Miller Stratvert PA

Po Box 25687

Albuquerque, NM 87125-0687

Kathryn Ritter Jochems

Attorney at Miller Stratvert P.A.

Po Box 25687

Albuquerque, NM 87125

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff's Declaratory Judgement Claim by Lupe Anaya (Itoh, Charlotte) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Order by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Settlement Conference for October 16, 2019 at 9:00 A.M. in Albuquerque 440 Hondo Courtroom before Magistrate Jerry H. Ritter. Settlement statements are due to chambers on or before October 2, 2019. (plp) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Discovery is to be complete by 2/18/2020. Motions are due by 3/25/2020. The Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 6/1/2020. (plp) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter: Scheduling Conference held on 6/26/2019. (plp) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lupe Anaya Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures (Itoh, Charlotte) Modified docket on 6/20/2019 to include detail (khs). (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Initial Disclosures (Schwarz, Todd) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint Status Report by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Schwarz, Todd) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for June 26, 2019 at 2:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Counsel shall call the toll-free AT&T conference line at (888) 278-0296, enter access code 9998216, and press # to be joined to the proceedings. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by June 19, 2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than June 6, 2019. (plp) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Schwarz, Todd) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 5 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Lupe Anaya, 4 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Lupe Anaya voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Itoh, Charlotte)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Schwarz, Todd)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Docket(#3) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (khs) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (khs) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6390599 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schwarz, Todd) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Schwarz, Todd) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-02092. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schwarz, Todd) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less