This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 17:15:15 (UTC).

Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC v. California Union Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 Anadarko E P Onshore LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against California Union Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sim Lake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01743

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sim Lake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC

Defendants

Century Indemnity Company

California Union Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J James Cooper

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

811 Main St, Ste 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Christopher T. Kuleba

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

I 00 I Brickell Bay Drive, Suite 900

Miami, FL 33131

John D Shugrue

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Brockins LLP

77 West Wacker Dr

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorneys

Cara Elizabeth Vasquez

Attorney at DLA Piper

1000 Louisiana St, Ste 2800

Houston, TX 77002

Aidan M. McCormack

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Mark L. Deckman

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Samantha Anne Craig

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1000 Louisiana, Ste 2800

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) ORDER - Granting #39 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

39 #1

Proposed Order

#39

(#39) Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, J) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

37 #6

Exhibit F

37 #3

Exhibit C

37 #2

Exhibit B

37 #1

Exhibit A

#37

(#37) REPLY in Support of #10 MOTION to Remand, filed by Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Cooper, J) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed.(Craig, Samantha) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company identifying Chubb Limited as Corporate Parent, filed.(Vasquez, Cara) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court #281, case number 2021-22882 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26504596) filed by Century Indemnity Company, California Union Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Vasquez, Cara) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER - Granting #39 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, J) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) SEALED REPLY in Support of re: #10 MOTION to Remand by Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Cooper, J) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) REPLY in Support of #10 MOTION to Remand, filed by Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Cooper, J) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Extension of Defendants' Reply Deadline by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed. (Craig, Samantha) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER - Granting #33 Motion for Mark L. Deckman to Appear Pro Hac Vice for California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER - Granting #32 Motion for Aidan M. McCormack to Appear Pro Hac Vice for California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MOTION for Mark L. Deckman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2021. (Craig, Samantha) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION for Aidan M. McCormack to Appear Pro Hac Vice by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2021. (Craig, Samantha) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER - Granting #22 Partially Unopposed MOTION to Seal Dkt. 21 Response to Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff is permitted to publicly file a redacted version of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration; 2. Plaintiff is permitted to file under seal the complete, unredacted version of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration; and 3. Plaintiff is permitted to file under seal Exhibits A, H, I, J, and K to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration, which shall be placed under seal of court and not become public or be included in the public records of this case. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand by Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cooper, J) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER - Granting #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration ; Pltf's Response due by 6/23/2021 re: #5 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed AMENDED #6 MOTION by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vasquez, Cara) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, J) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Seal Dkt 5 Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vasquez, Cara) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Proposed Order) (Vasquez, Cara) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed.(Craig, Samantha) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company identifying Chubb Limited as Corporate Parent, filed.(Vasquez, Cara) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court #281, case number 2021-22882 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26504596) filed by Century Indemnity Company, California Union Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Vasquez, Cara) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ANADARKO E& P ONSHORE LLC, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Daniel Shugrue

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Thomas Kuleba