This case was last updated from PACER on 09/08/2020 at 15:01:05 (UTC).

Amy Thomas-Lawson v. RLB Collective, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Amy Thomas-Lawson filed an Other lawsuit against RLB Collective, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna, Autumn D. Spaeth and David O. Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01212

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

Presiding Judges

James V. Selna

David O. Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amy Thomas-Lawson

Defendant

RLB Collective, Inc. doing business as Haven Society

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Seth Lehrman

Attorney at Edwards Pottinger LLC

425 North Andrews Avenue Suite 2

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Scott Edelsberg

Attorney at Edelsberg Law PA

20900 Ne 30Th Avenue Suite 417

Aventura, FL 33180

Defendant Attorney

Addison Kehr Adams

Attorney at Richardson & Patel LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90024

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 9/20/2020 re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #11 filed by Defendant RLB Collective, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adams, Addison) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to RLB Collective, Inc. answer now due 9/5/2020, filed by Defendant RLB Collective, Inc..(Attorney Addison Kehr Adams added to party RLB Collective, Inc.(pty:dft))(Adams, Addison) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

10 #1

Declaration of Service

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Amy Thomas-Lawson, upon Defendant RLB Collective, Inc. served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe, Receptionist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Lehrman, Seth) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#9

(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-01212 DOC (ADSx). (eva) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant RLB Collective, Inc. (et) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Amy Thomas-Lawson, (Lehrman, Seth) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Amy Thomas-Lawson. (Lehrman, Seth) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Amy Thomas-Lawson. (Lehrman, Seth) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27154777 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Amy Thomas-Lawson. (Attorney Seth Lehrman added to party Amy Thomas-Lawson(pty:pla))(Lehrman, Seth) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 9/20/2020 re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #11 filed by Defendant RLB Collective, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adams, Addison) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to RLB Collective, Inc. answer now due 9/5/2020, filed by Defendant RLB Collective, Inc..(Attorney Addison Kehr Adams added to party RLB Collective, Inc.(pty:dft))(Adams, Addison) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Amy Thomas-Lawson, upon Defendant RLB Collective, Inc. served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe, Receptionist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Lehrman, Seth) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-01212 DOC (ADSx). (eva) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant RLB Collective, Inc. (et) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Amy Thomas-Lawson, (Lehrman, Seth) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Amy Thomas-Lawson. (Lehrman, Seth) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Amy Thomas-Lawson. (Lehrman, Seth) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27154777 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Amy Thomas-Lawson. (Attorney Seth Lehrman added to party Amy Thomas-Lawson(pty:pla))(Lehrman, Seth) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less