This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 10:53:10 (UTC).

Amwear USA, Inc. v. Galls, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Amwear USA, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Galls, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edward B. Atkins and Robert E. Wier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00354

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Edward B. Atkins

Presiding Judge

Robert E. Wier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amwear USA, Inc.

Defendant

Galls, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas G. French

Attorney at Stoll, Keenon & Ogden, PLLC - Louisville

500 W. Jefferson Street, 2000 Pnc Plaza

Louisville, KY 40202-2874

Craig Christman Dilger

Attorney at Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC

500 W. Jefferson Street, 2000 Pnc Plaza

Louisville, KY 40202

Daniel L. Rasmussen

Attorney at Payne and Fears LLP

4 Park Plaza, Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant Attorneys

Jacob Raver

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP - Boston

100 Northern Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

Roberto M. Braceras

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP - Boston

100 Northern Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

Adrianne C. Strong

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP - Lexington

100 W. Main Street, Suite 900, City Center

Lexington, KY 40507

Andrew Kim

Attorney at Goodwin Procter, LLP - Washington

1900 N Street Nw

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

18 #3

Proposed Order

18 #2

Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing

18 #1

Exhibit 1 - Declaration

#18

(#18) MOTION for Jacob Raver to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Galls, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4790547)Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Strong, Adrianne) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

17 #3

Proposed Order

17 #2

Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing

17 #1

Exhibit 1 - Declaration

#17

(#17) MOTION for Andrew Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Galls, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4790539)Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Strong, Adrianne) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

16 #2

Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Galls, LLC c/o The Corporation Trust Company, as Registered Agent on 08/20/2020, filed by Amwear USA, Inc.. (Dilger, Craig) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#7

(#7) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amwear USA, Inc.. (Dilger, Craig) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#5

(#5) STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier. (MDC)cc: COR (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Craig Christman Dilger. #1 Complaint has been filed by Amwear USA, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (MDC) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Galls, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (MDC) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Galls, LLC

1 #1

Exhibit A - Annual Supply Agreement

#1

(#13) AGREED ORDER: Parties' #12 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer is GRANTED. Galls shall respond to the Pla's #1 Complaint on or by 10/01/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 09/03/2020. (MDC) cc: COR (Entered: 09/03/2020)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBAR STATUS Check completed as to Andrew Kim re #17 MOTION for Andrew Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Galls, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4790539). (MDC) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBAR STATUS Check completed as to Jacob Raver re #18 MOTION for Jacob Raver to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Galls, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4790547). (MDC) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBAR STATUS Check completed as to Roberto M. Braceras re #16 MOTION for Roberto M. Braceras to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Galls, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4790519). (MDC) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #16 , #17 and #18 Motion for Attys Roberto M. Braceras, Andrew Kim, and Jacob Raver Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dft Galls, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 10/02/2020. (MDC)cc: COR and Andrew Kim, Jacob Raver and Roberto Braceras by US Mail (Order + Atty Registration Form) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Jacob Raver to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Galls, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4790547)Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Strong, Adrianne) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Andrew Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Galls, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4790539)Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Strong, Adrianne) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Roberto M. Braceras to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Galls, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4790519)Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Strong, Adrianne) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Dismiss by Galls, LLC , MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint by Galls, LLC Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - California Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Annual Supply Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - May 11, 2020 letter, #4 Proposed Order)(Strong, Adrianne) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Galls, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Galls Intermediate Holdings, LLC for Galls, LLC.. (Strong, Adrianne) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AGREED ORDER: Parties' #12 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer is GRANTED. Galls shall respond to the Pla's #1 Complaint on or by 10/01/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 09/03/2020. (MDC) cc: COR (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF FILING by Amwear USA, Inc. re #9 MOTION for Daniel L. Rasmussen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amwear USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4756850) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Dilger, Craig) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Craig Christman Dilger re #9 MOTION for Daniel L. Rasmussen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amwear USA, Inc. Attorney failed to submit a proposed order as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled Notice of Filing, file the Notice using the event Notice of Filing, attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry. cc: COR (MDC) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Daniel L. Rasmussen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amwear USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4756850)Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Attachment CA Good Standing)(Dilger, Craig) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Galls, LLC c/o The Corporation Trust Company, as Registered Agent on 08/20/2020, filed by Amwear USA, Inc.. (Dilger, Craig) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amwear USA, Inc.. (Dilger, Craig) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier. (MDC)cc: COR (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Craig Christman Dilger. #1 Complaint has been filed by Amwear USA, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (MDC) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Galls, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (MDC) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketConflict Check run. (MDC) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4751924), filed by Amwear USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Annual Supply Agreement, #2 Summons Galls, LLC, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MDC) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less