This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2022 at 08:24:07 (UTC).

In Re: AMR Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 In Re AMR Corporation was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lorna G. Schofield. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-09819

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lorna G. Schofield

 

Party Details

Appellant

Lawrence M. Meadows

Park City, UT 84060

Appellee, In Re and Debtor

AMR Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorney

Alfredo Rey Perez

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP (TX)

700 Louisiana Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Sean H. Lane dated October 28, 2021. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 11-B-15463 (SHL). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Lawrence M. Meadows..(bkar) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#2

(#2) BANKRUPTCY APPEAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The above-captioned bankruptcy appeal has been assigned to me for all purposes. The appeal was docketed in the District Court on New York on November 23, 2021. Rule 8009 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedures ("FRBP") requires appellant to file "a designation of the items to be included in the record on appeal and a statement of the issues to be presented." Among other requirements, Rule 8009 provides that within 14 days after being served, the appellee may file with the bankruptcy clerk and serve on the appellant a designation of additional items to be included in the recorded. The time limits set forth in Rule 8009 are adopted as the Order of this Court. (As further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/1/2021) (va) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#3

(#3) DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellant Lawrence M. Meadows..(bkar) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#4

(#4) COUNTER DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Document filed by Appellee AMR Corporation..(bkar) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF RECORD OF APPEAL AVAILABILITY (COMPLETION). Re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. All Documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York have been filed with the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically. Appellant Brief due by 1/28/2022..(bkar) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RECORD OF APPEAL AVAILABILITY (COMPLETION). Re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. All Documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York have been filed with the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically. Appellant Brief due by 1/28/2022..(bkar) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COUNTER DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Document filed by Appellee AMR Corporation..(bkar) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellant Lawrence M. Meadows..(bkar) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) BANKRUPTCY APPEAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The above-captioned bankruptcy appeal has been assigned to me for all purposes. The appeal was docketed in the District Court on New York on November 23, 2021. Rule 8009 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedures ("FRBP") requires appellant to file "a designation of the items to be included in the record on appeal and a statement of the issues to be presented." Among other requirements, Rule 8009 provides that within 14 days after being served, the appellee may file with the bankruptcy clerk and serve on the appellant a designation of additional items to be included in the recorded. The time limits set forth in Rule 8009 are adopted as the Order of this Court. (As further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/1/2021) (va) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (bkar) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bkar) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Sean H. Lane dated October 28, 2021. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 11-B-15463 (SHL). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Lawrence M. Meadows..(bkar) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMR is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alfredo R Perez