This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/15/2021 at 07:13:14 (UTC).

Amplified AI, Inc. et al v. Mansfield

Case Summary

On September 16, 2021, Amplified AI, Inc. and Amplified AI PTY Limited (collectively, “Amplified” or “Plaintiffs”), represented by Jacob Marcus Heath of Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against James Mansfield (“Defendant”). Plaintiffs filed suit seeking permanent injunctive relief, punitive or exemplary damages, prejudgment and post-judgment interest and other relief for breach of Defendant’s employment agreement with Plaintiffs and violations of United States federal and California state law. This case was filed in the United States District Court in the Northern District of California with Judge Nathanael M. Cousins presiding.

This case arises out of Defendant James Mansfield’s (“Mansfield”) breach of his employment agreement with Amplified and his violations of United States federal and California state law. 

In the complaint, the Plaintiffs alleged that, “Mansfield utilized without authorization login credentials—including a username and password—to circumvent Amplified’s access controls and password protections, thereby gaining unauthorized access to the Amplified Design System, Wireframe, and Prototypes, and Unreleased Product Features. Mansfield created a backdoor to circumvent the access controls Amplified has implements by creating a secret login credential that used his private Gmail email address. The conduct described above has harmed Amplified in an amount to be computed at trial and constitutes violations of 17 U.S.C. § 1201.”

The Plaintiffs also alleged that, “The Amplified Design System, Wireframe, and Prototypes, and Unreleased Product Features constitute trade secrets used in interstate commerce within the meaning of 18 U.S.C. § 1836.” And that, “Mansfield have misappropriated Amplified’s trade secrets in violation of 18 U.S.C. § 1836. Mansfield’s misappropriation was not accidental or inadvertent and instead has been willful and malicious under 18 U.S.C. § 1836. Mansfield continues to misuse Amplified’s trade secrets, and continue to enjoy the benefits of his prior misuse, and will continue to do so unless enjoined by the Court.”

Further, the Plaintiffs alleged that, “Without authorization and in excess of authorization, Mansfield has violated the Computer Fraud and Abuse Act, 18 U.S.C. § 1030(a)(2)(C), by intentionally accessing Amplified’s protected computers.”

There are nine claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiffs. The first claim is for an alleged violation of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act, 17 U.S.C. § 1201(a)(1). The second claim is for the alleged misappropriation of trade secrets under the Defend Trade Secrets Act, 18 U.S.C. § 1836 et seq. The third claim is for alleged violations of the Computer Fraud and Abuse Act, 18 U.S.C. § 1030. The fourth claim is for an alleged violation of the California Comprehensive Computer Data Access and Fraud Act, California Penal Code § 502. The fifth claim is for the alleged breach of contract-employment agreement. The sixth claim is for alleged breach of contract of confidential information and the invention assignment agreement. The seventh claim is for the alleged breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing. The eighth claim is for alleged trespass to chattels and the ninth claim is for alleged conversion.

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiffs have requested the court to pass an order for an award of damages, unjust enrichment, lost profits, and/or a reasonable royalty for Mansfield’s willful and malicious misappropriation of Amplified’s trade secrets including statutory damages pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 1203, exemplary damages under 18 U.S.C. § 1836, up to twice actual damages, compensatory damages and punitive or exemplary damages for alleged violation of California Penal Code § 502(c). Further, the Plaintiffs requested the court for costs of suit and an injunctive relief along with an award of Amplified’s attorneys’ fees with prejudgment and postjudgment interest and costs of court and such other relief as the court may deem just equitable and proper.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-07179

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Nathanael M. Cousins

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMPLIFIED AI, INC.

AMPLIFIED AI PTY LIMITED

Defendant

James Mark Mansfield

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacob Marcus Heath

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Amanda Zohreh Saber

Attorney at Orrick Herrington Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025-1015

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2021 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2021. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/04/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

12 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

12 #12

Main Document

#10

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Amplified AI PTY Limited, Amplified AI, Inc... (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 9/30/2021) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

9 #2

Exhibit C

9 #1

Exhibit B

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT [First Amended Complaint] against All Defendants. Filed byAmplified AI, Inc., Amplified AI PTY Limited. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 9/28/2021) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to James Mansfield. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#3

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C to Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B to Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A to Complaint

8 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2021 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2021. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/04/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 10/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Amplified AI PTY Limited, Amplified AI, Inc... (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 9/30/2021) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EXHIBITS re #8 Amended Complaint [Exhibits A-C] filed byAmplified AI PTY Limited, Amplified AI, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 9/28/2021) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT [First Amended Complaint] against All Defendants. Filed byAmplified AI, Inc., Amplified AI PTY Limited. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 9/28/2021) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING A COPYRIGHT. The provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508 require the submission of a report to theRegister of Copyrights. Please e-file a proposed "Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright" form AO 121 using the event Civil Events Other Filings Notices Notice (Other), within five days of this notice. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to James Mansfield. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/30/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Amplified AI, Inc., Amplified AI PTY Limited (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 9/16/2021) Modified on 9/17/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 9/16/2021) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against James Mansfield (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16398648). Filed by Amplified AI, Inc., Amplified AI PTY Limited . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 9/16/2021) Modified on 9/17/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob Marcus Heath