This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2021 at 08:02:57 (UTC).

Amos, III v. Standard Management Services Delaware, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 Amos, III filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Standard Management Services Delaware, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jose E. Martinez and Jacqueline Becerra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-10127

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jose E. Martinez

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Becerra

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

M. EDWARD AMOS, III

Edward M. Amos, III

Defendants

PARADISE INN HOSTEL, LLC doing business as THE PARADISE INN

STANDARD MANAGEMENT SERVICES DELAWARE, LLC doing business as SMS Lodging, LLC

Paradise Inn Hostel, Inc. doing business as THE PARADISE INN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven H. Heisler

Attorney at The Law Offices of Steven H. Heisler, LLC

1011 North Calvert Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

Joel Justus Ewusiak

Attorney at Ewusiak Law, P.A.

6601 Memorial Highway, Suite 311

Tampa, FL 33615

Defendant Attorney

Gonzalo Barr

Attorney at Gonzalo Barr LLC

201 Alhambra Circle, Suite 1200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Trial set for 12/20/2021 at 9:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 12/16/2021 at 1:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 10/21/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by STANDARD MANAGEMENT SERVICES DELAWARE, LLC. Attorney Gonzalo Barr added to party STANDARD MANAGEMENT SERVICES DELAWARE, LLC(pty:dft). (Barr, Gonzalo) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by PARADISE INN HOSTEL, LLC. Attorney Gonzalo Barr added to party PARADISE INN HOSTEL, LLC(pty:dft). (Barr, Gonzalo) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by M. EDWARD AMOS, III. STANDARD MANAGEMENT SERVICES DELAWARE, LLC served on 12/7/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Ewusiak, Joel) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by M. EDWARD AMOS, III. PARADISE INN HOSTEL, LLC served on 12/7/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Ewusiak, Joel) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE,granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Steven H. Heisler, Esq.,. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

5 #2

Text of Proposed Order

5 #1

Certification

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Steven H. Heisler. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13848370 by M. EDWARD AMOS, III. Responses due by 11/25/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ewusiak, Joel) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#4

(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Steven H. Heisler, mailing date November 5, 2020, (pt) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to PARADISE INN HOSTEL, LLC, STANDARD MANAGEMENT SERVICES DELAWARE, LLC. (mee) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

1 #3

Summon(s) Summons to be issue for Standard Management Services Delaware, LLC

1 #2

Summon(s) Summons to be issued for Paradise Inn Hostel, LLC

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13815014, filed by M. EDWARD AMOS, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons to be issued for Paradise Inn Hostel, LLC, #3 Summon(s) Summons to be issue for Standard Management Services Delaware, LLC)(Ewusiak, Joel) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Trial set for 12/20/2021 at 9:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 12/16/2021 at 1:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 10/21/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by STANDARD MANAGEMENT SERVICES DELAWARE, LLC. Attorney Gonzalo Barr added to party STANDARD MANAGEMENT SERVICES DELAWARE, LLC(pty:dft). (Barr, Gonzalo) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by PARADISE INN HOSTEL, LLC. Attorney Gonzalo Barr added to party PARADISE INN HOSTEL, LLC(pty:dft). (Barr, Gonzalo) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by M. EDWARD AMOS, III. STANDARD MANAGEMENT SERVICES DELAWARE, LLC served on 12/7/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Ewusiak, Joel) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by M. EDWARD AMOS, III. PARADISE INN HOSTEL, LLC served on 12/7/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Ewusiak, Joel) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE,granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Steven H. Heisler, Esq.,. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Steven H. Heisler. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13848370 by M. EDWARD AMOS, III. Responses due by 11/25/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ewusiak, Joel) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Steven H. Heisler, mailing date November 5, 2020, (pt) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to PARADISE INN HOSTEL, LLC, STANDARD MANAGEMENT SERVICES DELAWARE, LLC. (mee) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13815014, filed by M. EDWARD AMOS, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons to be issued for Paradise Inn Hostel, LLC, #3 Summon(s) Summons to be issue for Standard Management Services Delaware, LLC)(Ewusiak, Joel) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less