This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/07/2022 at 08:13:22 (UTC).

Amory Investments LLC v. Cargill, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 Amory Investments LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Cargill, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mae A. D'Agostino and Miroslav Lovric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00222

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mae A. D'Agostino

Referral Judge

Miroslav Lovric

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amory Investments LLC

Defendants

Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation

Cargill, Inc.

Cargill Protein

Cargill Protein - North America

JBS S.A.

JBS USA Food Company

Swift Beef Company

JBS Packerland, Inc.

National Beef Packing Company

Tyson Foods, Inc.

Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan T. McAllister

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP

30 South Pearl Street - 11Th Floor

Albany, NY 12207

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Proposed Order/Judgment

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) MDL HEARING SESSION ORDER re: Oral Argument on motion to transfer to District of Minnesota scheduled for May 26, 2022. (amt) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#10

(#10) Letter from Austin Hurt: Courtesy Copies of Documents sent to MDL. (gmd, ) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

9 #2

Envelope

9 #1

Exhibit - MDL Amended Schedule of Actions

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) Copy of Plaintiff's Cheney Brothers, Inc.'s Subway Protein Litigation Corp., as Litigation Trustee of the Subway Protein Trust, and Amory Investments LLC's Motion for Transfer or Related Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Consolidated or Coordinated Pre-Trial Proceedings Part 1 filed by Garth T. Yearick Esq. (hmr) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

7 #8

Summons Issued as to Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.

7 #7

Summons Issued as to Tyson Foods, Inc.

7 #6

Summons Issued as to National Beef Packing Company

7 #5

Summons Issued as to JBS Packerland, Inc.

7 #4

Summons Issued as to Swift Beef Company

7 #3

Summons Issued as to JBS USA Food Company

7 #2

Summons Issued as to JBS S.A.

7 #1

Summons Issued as to Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Amory Investments LLC is requesting summons(es) be issued as to (McAllister, Ryan) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION Regarding Time to Respond to Complaint and Waiver of Service by Amory Investments LLC submitted to Judge Mae A. D'Agostino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment)(McAllister, Ryan) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MDL HEARING SESSION ORDER re: Oral Argument on motion to transfer to District of Minnesota scheduled for May 26, 2022. (amt) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter from Austin Hurt: Courtesy Copies of Documents sent to MDL. (gmd, ) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Copy of Plaintiff's Cheney Brothers, Inc.'s Subway Protein Litigation Corp., as Litigation Trustee of the Subway Protein Trust, and Amory Investments LLC's Motion for Transfer or Related Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Consolidated or Coordinated Pre-Trial Proceedings Part 2 filed by Garth T. Yearick Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - MDL Amended Schedule of Actions, #2 Envelope)(hmr) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Copy of Plaintiff's Cheney Brothers, Inc.'s Subway Protein Litigation Corp., as Litigation Trustee of the Subway Protein Trust, and Amory Investments LLC's Motion for Transfer or Related Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Consolidated or Coordinated Pre-Trial Proceedings Part 1 filed by Garth T. Yearick Esq. (hmr) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summonses Issued as to Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc., JBS Packerland, Inc., JBS S.A., JBS USA Food Company, National Beef Packing Company, Swift Beef Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, #2 Summons Issued as to JBS S.A., #3 Summons Issued as to JBS USA Food Company, #4 Summons Issued as to Swift Beef Company, #5 Summons Issued as to JBS Packerland, Inc., #6 Summons Issued as to National Beef Packing Company, #7 Summons Issued as to Tyson Foods, Inc., #8 Summons Issued as to Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.)(hmr) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Amory Investments LLC is requesting summons(es) be issued as to (McAllister, Ryan) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the #1 Complaint, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Proposed Summons(es) were not included with the Complaint. Counsel is directed to file proposed summons(es) on the docket using the REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) event within 3 days of this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 3/14/2022 (hmr) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • Docket(#5) TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (hmr) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Colleen Harrison, Email address is charrison@bsfllp.com. Phone number is 914-749-8204. Admissions due by 3/22/2022. [Notice was email to Attorney Harrison on 3/8/2022.](hmr) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Scott E. Gant, Email address is sgant@bsfllp.com. Phone number is 202-237-2727; Attorney Michael S. Mitchell, Email address is mmitchell@bsfllp.com. Phone number is 202-237-2727; Attorney Sarah L. Jones, Email address is sgant@bsfllp.com. Phone number is 202-237-2727. [Notice was emailed to Attorney Gant, Attorney Mitchell and Attorney Jones on 3/8/2022.] Admissions due by 3/22/2022. (hmr) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/8/2022 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/1/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc., JBS Packerland, Inc., JBS S.A., JBS USA Food Company, National Beef Packing Company, Swift Beef Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5830285) filed by Amory Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JBS Packerland, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Swift Beef Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation is a litigant