This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2021 at 11:28:43 (UTC).

Amons v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Amons filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael J. Truncale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00129

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. Truncale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shadrick Amons

Defendants

Administrator Benefits ExxonMobil Corporation

Life Insurance Company of North America

ExxonMobil Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reagan Toledano

Attorney at Willeford & Toledano

201 St Charles Avenue, Suite 4208

New Orleans, LA 70170

Defendant Attorney

Scott Deloss Huffstetler

Attorney at Kean Miller LLP - Baton Rouge

P O Box 3513

Baton Rouge, LA 70821-3513

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Administrator Benefits ExxonMobil Corporation.( Huffstetler, Scott) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#10

(#10) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ExxonMobil Corporation.( Huffstetler, Scott) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#9

(#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Life Insurance Company of North America.( Huffstetler, Scott) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shadrick Amons. Administrator Benefits ExxonMobil Corporation waiver sent on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Toledano, Reagan) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shadrick Amons. ExxonMobil Corporation waiver sent on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Toledano, Reagan) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shadrick Amons. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 3/31/2021, answer due 5/30/2021. (Toledano, Reagan) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shadrick Amons. ExxonMobil Corporation served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Toledano, Reagan) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shadrick Amons. Administrator Benefits ExxonMobil Corporation served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Toledano, Reagan) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Administrator Benefits ExxonMobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Corporation, and Life Insurance Company of North America. (kcv, ) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Reagan Toledano on behalf of Shadrick Amons. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8325372. (Toledano, Reagan) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

1 #6

Summons(es)

1 #5

Summons(es)

1 #4

Summons(es)

1 #3

Summons(es)

1 #2

Summons(es)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8323001.), filed by Shadrick Amons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es), #6 Summons(es))(Toledano, Reagan) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Administrator Benefits ExxonMobil Corporation to 6/25/2021. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( kcv, ) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ExxonMobil Corporation to 6/25/2021. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( kcv, ) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Life Insurance Company of North America to 6/25/2021. 26 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( kcv, ) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Administrator Benefits ExxonMobil Corporation.( Huffstetler, Scott) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ExxonMobil Corporation.( Huffstetler, Scott) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Life Insurance Company of North America.( Huffstetler, Scott) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shadrick Amons. Administrator Benefits ExxonMobil Corporation waiver sent on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Toledano, Reagan) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shadrick Amons. ExxonMobil Corporation waiver sent on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Toledano, Reagan) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shadrick Amons. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 3/31/2021, answer due 5/30/2021. (Toledano, Reagan) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shadrick Amons. ExxonMobil Corporation served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Toledano, Reagan) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shadrick Amons. Administrator Benefits ExxonMobil Corporation served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Toledano, Reagan) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Administrator Benefits ExxonMobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Corporation, and Life Insurance Company of North America. (kcv, ) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Reagan Toledano on behalf of Shadrick Amons. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8325372. (Toledano, Reagan) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (kcv, ) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (kcv, ) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8323001.), filed by Shadrick Amons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es), #6 Summons(es))(Toledano, Reagan) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ExxonMobil Oil Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reagan Levert Toledano