This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/14/2019 at 07:26:19 (UTC).

Ammons v. Diversified Adjustment Service Incorporated

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 Ammons filed an Other lawsuit against Diversified Adjustment Service Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Diane J Humetewa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-MC-00013

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Diane J Humetewa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michele Ammons

Petitioner

Thompson Consumer Law Group PLLC

Defendant

Diversified Adjustment Service Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Ali Chami

Attorney at Chami Law Firm PLLC

8245 N 85Th Way

Scottsdale, AZ 85258

Lauren T Rodkey

Attorney at Price Law Group APC - Encino, CA

6345 Balboa Blvd., Ste. 247

Encino, CA 91316

Brian J Brazier

Attorney at Price Law Group APC - Encino, CA

6345 Balboa Blvd., Ste. 247

Encino, CA 91316

Petitioner Attorneys

David Neal McDevitt

Attorney at Thompson Consumer Law Group PLLC

5235 E Southern Ave., Ste. D106-618

Mesa, AZ 85206

Russell Snow Thompson, IV

Attorney at Thompson Consumer Law Group PLLC

5235 E Southern Ave., Ste. D106-618

Mesa, AZ 85206

Defendant Attorneys

Mark E Ellis

Attorney at Ellis Law Group

1425 River Park Dr., Ste. 400

Sacramento, CA 95815

Lawrence K Iglesias

Attorney at Ellis Law Group

1425 River Park Dr., Ste. 400

Sacramento, CA 95815

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re: #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Michele Ammons. (Chami, David) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE re: Service of Motion to Quash Subpoena by Thompson Consumer Law Group PLLC . (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER that within three (3) days from the date of this Order, Movant Thompson Consumer Law Group shall provide a copy of its Motion to Quash, along with exhibits, to all parties in both the California action and the Florida action, and file a notice of service. ORDERED that any response(s) to the #1 Motion to Quash must be filed on or before May 31, 2019. No reply will be allowed. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/21/2019. (LFIG) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thompson Consumer Law Group PLLC. (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Diversified Adjustment Service Incorporated. (MFR) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Thompson Consumer Law Group PLLC. (MFR) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#2

(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16917352. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: MC-19-0013-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - Subpoena

1 #3

Exhibit C - Affidavit of David N. McDevitt

1 #2

Exhibit B - Text Order Approving Stipulated Protective Order

1 #1

Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order in Eady

#1

(#1) Miscellaneous Case Opening Regarding: Motions to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum - FRCVP 45. Case Opening Fee Received: $ 47.00 receipt number 0970-16917352 filed by Thompson Consumer Law Group PLLC. (Thompson, Russell) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order in Eady, #2 Exhibit B - Text Order Approving Stipulated Protective Order, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of David N. McDevitt, #4 Exhibit D - Subpoena, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to Motion re: #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Michele Ammons. (Chami, David) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE re: Service of Motion to Quash Subpoena by Thompson Consumer Law Group PLLC . (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER that within three (3) days from the date of this Order, Movant Thompson Consumer Law Group shall provide a copy of its Motion to Quash, along with exhibits, to all parties in both the California action and the Florida action, and file a notice of service. ORDERED that any response(s) to the #1 Motion to Quash must be filed on or before May 31, 2019. No reply will be allowed. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/21/2019. (LFIG) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thompson Consumer Law Group PLLC. (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Diversified Adjustment Service Incorporated. (MFR) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Thompson Consumer Law Group PLLC. (MFR) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16917352. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: MC-19-0013-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Miscellaneous Case Opening Regarding: Motions to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum - FRCVP 45. Case Opening Fee Received: $ 47.00 receipt number 0970-16917352 filed by Thompson Consumer Law Group PLLC. (Thompson, Russell) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order in Eady, #2 Exhibit B - Text Order Approving Stipulated Protective Order, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of David N. McDevitt, #4 Exhibit D - Subpoena, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Diversified Adjustment Service, Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian James Brazier

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Chami

Latest cases represented by Lawyer L. Tegan Rodkey