This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:49:02 (UTC).

Amling v. Saul

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Amling filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Iain D. Johnston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-50119

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Iain D. Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Niki Amling

Defendants

Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill

Andrew Marshall Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Frederick J. Daley, Jr.

Attorney at Daley Disability Law, P.C.

4256 N. Ravenswood Ave, Suite 104

Chicago, IL 60613

Meredith Emily Marcus

Attorney at Daley Disability Law, P.C.

4256 N. Ravenswood Ave, Suite 104

Chicago, IL 60613

Jana L Brady

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

327 South Church, Suite 330

Rockford, IL 61101

AUSA-SSA

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office (NDIL - Chicago)

219 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

Monica V Mallory

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

327 South Church Street, Suite 3300

Rockford, IL 61101

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFIED COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Andrew Marshall Saul (Attachments: #1 001, #2 002, #3 003, #4 004, #5 005, #6 006, #7 007, #8 008, #9 009, #10 010, #11 011, #12 012, #13 013, #14 014)(Brady, Jana) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WITHDRAWING Monica V. Mallory as counsel for Defendant Nancy Ann Berryhill and substituting Jana L Brady as counsel of record (Brady, Jana) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Signed by Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/24/2019. (jp, ) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marcus, Meredith) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DESIGNATION of Monica V Mallory as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill (Mallory, Monica) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Pursuant to the Second Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 3/28/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin and referred generally to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/28/2019.(jp, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Niki Amling by Meredith Emily Marcus (Marcus, Meredith) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Niki Amling by Frederick J. Daley, Jr (Daley, Frederick) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin and Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Niki Amling; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15840577. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daley, Frederick) Modified on 5/20/2019 (pg, ). (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.