Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/26/2021 at 08:58:45 (UTC).

AML IP, LLC v. Nordstrom, Inc.

Case Summary

On April 27, 2021, AML IP, LLC (“AML” or “Plaintiff”), represented by William P. Ramey, III of Ramey & Schwaller, LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Nordstrom, Inc. (“Nordstrom” or “Defendant”), seeking injunctive relief, royalty, wilful and additional damages for alleged infringement of technology relating to method and apparatus for conducting electronic commerce transactions using electronic tokens. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding. 

 

AML asserted that the Plaintiff is the legal owner by assignment of all rights, title and interest in United States and foreign patents and applications including United States Patent No. 7,177,838 (“the ‘838 patent”), (referred to as the “Patent-in-Suit”), entitled “Method and Apparatus for Conducting Electronic Commerce Transactions Using Electronic Tokens”, which was duly and legally issued by the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office on February 13, 2007. 

 

In its complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Nordstrom maintains, operates, and administers micropayment products and services that facilitate purchases from a vendor at micropayment levels, wherein prices for the products and services are listed in units of electronic tokens that infringes one or more claims of the ‘838 patent, Nordstrom has actively encouraged or instructed others (e.g., its customers and/or the customers of its related companies), and continues to do so, on how to use its products and services (e.g., micropayment products and services that facilitate purchases from a vendor at micropayment levels, wherein prices for the products and services are listed in units of electronic tokens) such as to cause infringement of one or more of claims 1–28 of the ‘838 patent.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Nordstrom Inc. performed and induced others to perform the step of issuing one or more electronic tokens from the vendor to the user account, wherein no physical manifestation, other than a database entry, of the user account occurs, each electronic token having a value of at least a fraction of a dollar”. Apart from that “Nordstrom Inc. provides products and services including but not limited to men and women clothing, footwear and accessories that are available to be purchased by the users. The prices of products listed on Nordstrom.com and Nordstrom mobile application are in dollars which is further indicative of Nordstrom Notes (“electronic tokens”).”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Nordstrom had and continued to contributorily infringe because it had known about the ‘838 patent and the technology underlying it from at least the date of issuance of the patent”, despite that it continued to cause AML damage by direct and indirect infringement of Patent - in - suit.”



There is one claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff relating to the alleged infringement of the Patent - in - suit as stated above. 

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the court to enter a judgment that Defendant has infringed the claims of the ‘838 patent, awarding AML damages in an amount sufficient to compensate it for Defendant’s infringement of the ‘838 patent in an amount no less than a reasonable royalty or lost profits, together with prejudgment and post-judgment interest and costs, declaring Defendant’s infringement to be wilful, and a decree addressing future infringement that either awards permanent injunction or damages. 

 

Disclaimer: This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

 

 




Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00416

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AML IP, LLC

Defendant

Nordstrom, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P. Ramey, III

Attorney at Ramey & Schwaller, LLP

5020 Montose Blvd., Suite 800

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14740254), filed by AML IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US 7177838, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#9

(#9) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint UNOPPOSED by AML IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) CORRECTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint UNOPPOSED by AML IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by AML IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AML IP, LLC. Nordstrom, Inc. served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Nordstrom, Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by AML IP, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit US 7177838

6 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Nordstrom, Inc. answer due 7/3/2021. (bw) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Court having considered this Motion for Extension for Nordstrom, Inc. to Answer the Complaint in this matter including July 3, 2021 and that Plaintiff does not oppose this motion, the Motion is for Extension to Answer Complaint including July 3, 2021 is hereby GRANTED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint UNOPPOSED by AML IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Nordstrom, Inc. answer due 6/3/2021. (lad) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Court having considered this Motion for Extension for Nordstrom, Inc. to Answer the Complaint in this matter including July 3, 2021 and that Plaintiff does not oppose this motion, the Motion for Extension to Answer Complaint including June 3, 2021 is hereby GRANTED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order MOOTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORRECTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint UNOPPOSED by AML IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by AML IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AML IP, LLC. Nordstrom, Inc. served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Nordstrom, Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by AML IP, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14740254), filed by AML IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US 7177838, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AML IP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Nordstrom, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William P. Ramey, III