Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2021 at 10:37:06 (UTC).

AML IP, LLC v. Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.

Case Summary

On February 26, 2021, AML IP, LLC (“Plaintiff” or “AML”), represented by William P. Ramey, III of Ramey & Schwaller, LLP filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (“Blizzard” or “Defendant”). Seeking injunctive relief, damages among other reliefs for allegedly infringing AML’s intellectual property relating to a novel and improved methods and apparatuses for conducting electronic commerce. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding

 

The Plaintiff alleged that the Defendant has allegedly infringed one or more claims under United States Patent Number 6,876,979 entitled “Electronic Commerce Bridge System” (“the ’979 Patent”) owned by AML (the “Patent-in-Suit”).

 

Plaintiff alleged that “Blizzard maintains, operates, and administers payment products and services that facilitate purchases from a vendor using a bridge computer that infringes one or more claims of the ‘979 patent, including one or more of claims 1-13, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents. Defendant put the inventions claimed by the ‘979 Patent into service (i.e., used them); but for Defendant’s actions, the claimed-inventions embodiments involving Defendant’s products and services would never have been put into service. Defendant’s acts complained of herein caused those claimed-invention embodiments as a whole to perform, and Defendant’s procurement of monetary and commercial benefit from it.”

 

Plaintiff further alleged that “Blizzard has and continues to induce infringement. Blizzard has actively encouraged or instructed others (e.g., its customers and/or the customers of its related companies), and continues to do so, on how to use its products and services (e.g., payment products and services that facilitate purchases from a vendor using a bridge computer) such as to cause infringement of one or more of claims 1–13 of the ‘979 patent, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents. Moreover, Blizzard has known or should have known of the ‘979 patent and the technology underlying it from at least the date of issuance of the patent.” and that “Blizzard has known or should have known of the ‘979 patent and the technology underlying it from at least the date of issuance of the patent”.



The only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff is for the alleged infringement of one or more claims of the ‘979 Patent.

 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court to pass an order that Defendant has infringed patent-in-suit, award Plaintiff damages in an amount no less than a reasonable royalty or lost profits, together with pre-judgment and post-judgment interest and costs under 35 U.S.C. § 284, grant Plaintiff permanent injunctive relief against Defendant addressing future infringement. Plaintiff further requested the court award AML an accounting for acts of infringement not presented at trial and an award by the court of additional damage for any such acts of infringement, and to declare Defendant’s infringement to be willful and treble the damages, including attorneys’ fees, expenses, and costs incurred in this action and an increase in the damage award pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 284.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00184

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AML IP, LLC

Defendant

Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P. Ramey, III

Attorney at Ramey & Schwaller, LLP

5020 Montose Blvd., Suite 800

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorneys

John B. Campbell, Jr.

Attorney at McKool Smith PC

300 West 6Th Street, Suite 1700

Austin, TX 78701

Alan Peter Block

Attorney at McKool Smith Hennigan, PC

300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal by AML IP, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

10 #17

Proposed Order

10 #15

Exhibit 14

10 #14

Exhibit 13

10 #11

Exhibit 10

10 #10

Exhibit 9

10 #9

Exhibit 8

10 #8

Exhibit 7

10 #7

Exhibit 6

10 #6

Exhibit 5

10 #5

Exhibit 4

10 #4

Exhibit 3

10 #3

Exhibit 2

10 #2

Exhibit 1

10 #1

Affidavit John B. Campbell

#10

(#10) MOTION to Transfer Case by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit John B. Campbell, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Affidavit Andrew Murphy, #17 Proposed Order)(Campbell, John) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John B. Campbell, Jr Alan P. Block ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14619721) by on behalf of Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Campbell, John) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

21 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal by AML IP, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alan Peter Block for Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Transfer Case by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit John B. Campbell, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Affidavit Andrew Murphy, #17 Proposed Order)(Campbell, John) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Campbell, John) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Campbell, John) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John B. Campbell, Jr Alan P. Block ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14619721) by on behalf of Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Campbell, John) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John B. Campbell, Jr on behalf of Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. Attorney John B. Campbell, Jr added to party Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft) (Campbell, John) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AML IP, LLC. Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (am) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by AML IP, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14534934), filed by AML IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US6876979, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Blizzard Entertainment Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where AML IP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan Peter Block

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Bruce Campbell