This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2021 at 09:21:45 (UTC).

AML IP, LLC v. ADORN BOUTIQUE, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 AML IP, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ADORN BOUTIQUE, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00599

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AML IP, LLC

Defendant

ADORN BOUTIQUE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P. Ramey, III

Attorney at Ramey & Schwaller, LLP

5020 Montose Blvd., Suite 800

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorneys

Alex Q. Jacobs

Attorney at Shore Chan LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 3300

Dallas, TX 75202

Mark D. Siegmund

Attorney at Law Firm of Walt Fair, PLLC

1508 North Valley Mills Drive

Waco, TX 76710

Alfonso Garcia Chan

Attorney at Shore Chan LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 3300

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ADORN BOUTIQUE, LLC.(Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark D. Siegmund for Alex Q. Jacobs ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14995351) by on behalf of ADORN BOUTIQUE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: ADORN BOUTIQUE, LLC answer due 8/5/2021. (ir) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including August 5, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ADORN BOUTIQUE, LLC. (Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AML IP, LLC. ADORN BOUTIQUE, LLC served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to ADORN BOUTIQUE, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by AML IP, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14901152), filed by AML IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US6876979, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AML IP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark D. Siegmund

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alfonso Garcia Chan