This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:26:55 (UTC).

Amison v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al (Osceola County)

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Amison filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Corrections Osceola County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory J. Kelly and G. Kendall Sharp. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-02294

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

Presiding Judge

G. Kendall Sharp

 

Party Details

Petitioner

James Amison

Crestview, FL 32539-6708

Respondents

Attorney General, State of Florida

Secretary, Department of Corrections

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by James Amison. Related case(s): yes (SPM) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER to respond and show cause, within 90 days, why the petition should not be granted. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 1/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Habeas petition)(LAK) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by James Amison. (No fee paid and no IFP motion filed)(SPM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER. Petitioner shall file an Affidavit of Indigency or other application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full filing fee within 21 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 1/6/2020. (LAK) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

(#2) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 12/6/2019. (copy mailed)(AKC) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit Habeas petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER to respond and show cause, within 90 days, why the petition should not be granted. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 1/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Habeas petition)(LAK) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketHABEAS FEES paid by James Amison (Filing fee $5.00 receipt number ORL088474) (KNC) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER. Petitioner shall file an Affidavit of Indigency or other application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full filing fee within 21 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 1/6/2020. (LAK) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by James Amison. Related case(s): yes (SPM) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 12/6/2019. (copy mailed)(AKC) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by James Amison. (No fee paid and no IFP motion filed)(SPM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.