This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/15/2020 at 08:32:05 (UTC).

Amirali Jiwani v. Solenis LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Amirali Jiwani filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Solenis LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. McDermott and Dale S. Fischer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06402

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amirali Jiwani

Defendants

Russell Mack

Solenis LLC

DOES 1-25, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alishan Jadhavji

Attorney at Jadhavji Law Firm

2408 34Th Street Unit 3

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Defendant Attorneys

Kate Elsa Juvinall

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

20851 Martha Street

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Randall S. Thompson

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza Suite 600

St Louis, MO 63105

Danielle J Reid

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza Suite 600

St Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific C

#9

8 #1

Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific C

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 10/18/21. (rfi) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court takes the Scheduling Conference off calendar and establishes the case management dates as proposed by parties in the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as further described in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates except as noted in the Order re Trial. (See Order re Trial for specific dates and times.) These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine unless the Court orders otherwise. All fictitiously named defendants are dismissed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendant Solenis LLC.. (Juvinall, Kate) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #8 Non-Resident Attorney Randall S. Thompson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Solenis LLC, designating Kate Elsa Juvinall as local counsel. (et) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #9 Non-Resident Attorney Danielle J Reid APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Solenis LLC, designating Kate E Juvinall as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Danielle J. Reid to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Solenis LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27620010) filed by Defendant Solenis LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Juvinall, Kate) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Randall S. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Solenis LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 8/13/2020, Receipt No. 27619743) filed by Defendant Solenis LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Juvinall, Kate) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Solenis LLC in Los Angeles Superior Court on 7/17/2020, attached as Exhibit A.(jtil) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Amirali Jiwani in Los Angeles Superior Court on 6/12/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Russell Mack, Solenis LLC. (Juvinall, Kate) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Solenis LLC. (Juvinall, Kate) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Los Angeles, case number 20STCV22331 Receipt No: ACACDC-27255930 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Solenis LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Attorney Kate Elsa Juvinall added to party Solenis LLC(pty:dft))(Juvinall, Kate) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOLENIS LLC is a litigant