This case was last updated from PACER on 08/15/2021 at 07:59:04 (UTC).

Aminov v. United Natural Foods, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 Aminov filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against United Natural Foods, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Diane Gujarati and James R. Cho. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03405

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Diane Gujarati

Referral Judge

James R. Cho

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arkadiy Aminov

Defendants

Selby Baptiste

United Natural Foods, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Barbera

Attorney at Shavitz & Shavitz

148-55 Hillside Ave

Jamaica, NY 11435

Defendant Attorney

Christopher Patrick Keenoy

Attorney at Morrison Mahoney LLP

120 Broadway, Suite 1010

New York, NY 10271

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Proposed Scheduling Order by Selby Baptiste, United Natural Foods, Inc. (Keenoy, Christopher) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

4 #1

Chamber's Individual Rules

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

#1

No Description Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketMEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. (Priftakis, Tina) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry: Initial Conference Hearing held on 8/5/2021 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Stuart Sears appeared for plaintiff; Christopher Keenoy appeared for defendants. Case discussed. Parties expressed an interest in conducting limited discovery, including the production of medical records and depositions, before participating in mediation. Parties will engaged in limited discovery to facilitate settlement discussions. Case referred to Court-annexed mediation. Parties to select a mediator by 8/19/2021 and complete mediation by 11/30/2021. Parties to submit a joint status report two weeks after completing mediation, but no later than 12/14/2021, whichever date is earlier. The Court entered the following pre-trial schedule: parties to exchange initial disclosures by 8/18/2021; no amendment of the pleadings or joinder of additional parties after 12/31/2021; and parties to complete fact discovery by 2/4/2022. The Court enter an expert discovery schedule after the parties have completed fact discovery. (AT&T Conference Bridge.) (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Scheduling Order by Selby Baptiste, United Natural Foods, Inc. (Keenoy, Christopher) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic-Initial Conference will be held at 11:00 a.m. on August 5, 2021 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Counsel for defendants is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with plaintiff's counsel. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Proposed Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than August 3, 2021. Each party is directed to call toll free (888) 808-6929 and use access code 1065334. The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 6/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketThis case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please submit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Queens County Supreme Court, case number 724709/2020. (Keenoy, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14571906 (Keenoy, Christopher) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED NATURAL FOODS, INC. is a litigant