This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2021 at 10:36:35 (UTC).

Aminov v. Shellpoint Partners LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Aminov filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Shellpoint Partners LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lorna G. Schofield. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05585

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lorna G. Schofield

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roman Aminov

Defendants

Newrez LLC

Shellpoint Partners LLC

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER: Initial Telephonic Conference set for 10/7/2021 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/12/2021) The clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to the pro se Plaintiff. (tg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Newrez LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Roman Aminov..(rdz) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shellpoint Partners LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Roman Aminov..(rdz) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Newrez LLC, Shellpoint Partners LLC. Document filed by Roman Aminov.(rdz) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed a copy of #5 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, to Roman Aminov at 60 Oceana Dr. W, 7A, Brooklyn, NY 11235. (dsh) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Initial Telephonic Conference set for 10/7/2021 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/12/2021) The clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to the pro se Plaintiff. (tg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketMailed a copy of Summons Issued to Roman Aminov at 60 Oceana Dr. W, 7A, Brooklyn, NY 11235. (sha) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Newrez LLC. (sha) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Shellpoint Partners LLC. (sha) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketPro Se Payment of Fee Processed: Check $402.00 processed by the Finance Department on 7/12/2021, Receipt Number 465401282638. (jcf) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Newrez LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Roman Aminov..(rdz) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shellpoint Partners LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Roman Aminov..(rdz) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Newrez LLC, Shellpoint Partners LLC. Document filed by Roman Aminov.(rdz) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less