This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:58:10 (UTC).

Amill-Cintron v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Amill-Cintron filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marshal D. Morgan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01472

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marshal D. Morgan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan M Amill-Cintron

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez

Attorney at Pedro G Cruz-Sanchez Law Office

P.O. Box 372290

Cayey, PR 00737

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER re #5 Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge. This case is referred to a United States Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 5/20/2019.(ab) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: Granted #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Francisco A. Besosa (Docket No. 7), this case has been randomly assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan pursuant to conduct all proceedings and entry of judgment. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 19-1472 (MDM). Judge Francisco A. Besosa is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 05/20/2019. (ft) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER re #5 Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge. This case is referred to a United States Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 5/20/2019.(ab) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Susan M Amill-Cintron. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Susan M Amill-Cintron (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Susan M Amill-Cintron. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Susan M Amill-Cintron. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Susan M Amill-Cintron Responses due by 5/31/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.