This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 07:52:43 (UTC).

Amica Mutual Insurance Company v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 Amica Mutual Insurance Company filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Home Depot U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas J. Whelan and Bernard G. Skomal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00629

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas J. Whelan

Referral Judge

Bernard G. Skomal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amica Mutual Insurance Company

Defendants

Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

John Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hanni Pichel

Defendant Attorney

Robert Kenneth Dixon

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mef)(jrd) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. served. (Pichel, Hanni) (dlg). (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Dixon, Robert)Attorney Robert Kenneth Dixon added to party Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Pichel, Hanni) (dlg). (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Amica Mutual Insurance Company . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Pichel, Hanni) (dlg). (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Dixon, Robert) (dlg). (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/16/2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Joint Discovery Plan due 9/2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 6/15/22.(dlg) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/16/2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Joint Discovery Plan due 9/2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 6/15/22.(dlg) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Dixon, Robert) (dlg). (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Amica Mutual Insurance Company . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Pichel, Hanni) (dlg). (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Pichel, Hanni) (dlg). (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Dixon, Robert)Attorney Robert Kenneth Dixon added to party Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. served. (Pichel, Hanni) (dlg). (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas J. Whelan for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22cv629-W-BGS.(no document attached) (ddf) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mef)(jrd) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., John Does 1-10 (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-16794982.) filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover sheet)The new case number is 3:22-cv-629-BEN-BGS. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Pichel, Hanni)(mef)(jrd) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less