This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/13/2022 at 09:26:02 (UTC).

AMGEN INC. v. APOTEX INC.

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 AMGEN INC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against APOTEX INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Douglas E. Arpert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-03827

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Arpert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMGEN INC.

Defendant

APOTEX INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHARLES H. CHEVALIER

Attorney at GIBBONS PC

One Gateway Center

Newark, NJ 07102

CHRISTINE A. GADDIS

Attorney at GIBBONS P.C.

141 West Front Street, Suite 240

Red Bank, NJ 07701

STEPHEN R. DONAT

Attorney at Gibbons P.C.

One Gateway Center

Newark, NJ 07102-5310

Defendant Attorneys

MELISSA E. FLAX

Attorney at CARELLA BYRNE CECCHI OLSTEIN BRODY & AGNELLO, PC

5 Becker Farm Road

Roseland, NJ 07068

MICHAEL K. BELOSTOCK

Attorney at CARELLA, BYRNE, CECCHI, OLSTEIN, BRODY & AGNELLO, P.C.

5 Becker Farm Road

Roseland, NJ 07068

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Gregory Bonifield to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13574534.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#25

(#25) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice C. Nichole Gifford to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13574527.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#24

(#24) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Eric M. Agovino to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13574520.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#23

(#23) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Wendy W. Whiteford to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13574508.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#22

(#22) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice M. Nicholas Rutigliano to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13574455.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#21

(#21) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Alexa Hansen to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13574441.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#20

(#20) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Alexander Trzeciak to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13574436.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#19

(#19) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Priscilla Dodson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13574431.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#18

(#18) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael N. Kennedy to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13574426.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#3

(#3) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (kht) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMGEN INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

1 #6

Local Civil Rule 11.2 Certification

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice counsel, GEORGE F. PAPPAS, JEFFREY B. ELIKAN, MICHAEL N. KENNEDY, PRISCILLA DODSON, ALEXANDER TRZECIAK, ALEXA R. HANSEN, M. NICHOLAS RUTIGLIANO, WENDY W. WHITEFORD, ERIC M. AGOVINO, C. NICHOLE GIFFORD and GREGORY BONIFIELD, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jal, ) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Gregory Bonifield to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13574534.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice C. Nichole Gifford to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13574527.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Eric M. Agovino to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13574520.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Wendy W. Whiteford to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13574508.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice M. Nicholas Rutigliano to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13574455.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Alexa Hansen to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13574441.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Alexander Trzeciak to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13574436.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Priscilla Dodson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13574431.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael N. Kennedy to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13574426.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL K. BELOSTOCK on behalf of APOTEX INC. (BELOSTOCK, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA E. FLAX on behalf of APOTEX INC. (FLAX, MELISSA) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AMGEN INC.. APOTEX INC. waiver sent on 6/16/2022, answer due 9/14/2022. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN R. DONAT on behalf of AMGEN INC. (DONAT, STEPHEN) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE A. GADDIS on behalf of AMGEN INC. (GADDIS, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to APOTEX INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (kht) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketJudge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (kht) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMGEN INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against APOTEX INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13484675) , Related Case Selected, filed by AMGEN INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Local Civil Rule 11.2 Certification)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amgen Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Apotex Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELISSA E. FLAX