This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 08:04:29 (UTC).

Ames v. Saul

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Ames filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stefan R Underhill, Sarah A. L. Merriam and Jeffrey A. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01947

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sarah A. L. Merriam

Presiding Judges

Stefan R Underhill

Jeffrey A. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer M. Ames

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Interested Party

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ivan Michael Katz

Attorney at Law Offices of Ivan M. Katz

57 Trumbull St., 3Rd Fl.

New Haven, CT 06510-1004

Defendant Attorney

Benil Abraham

Attorney at Social Security Administration - NY

26 Federal Plaza

New York, NY 10278

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

5 #1

Consent Form

#6

(#6) Standing Scheduling Order Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/11/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#12

(#12) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/30/2019.(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/11/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#5

(#5) Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#9

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/30/2019.(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docket(#11) GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The Commissioner shall file its answer and the administrative record on or before February 26, 2020. Plaintiff shall file a Motion to Reverse and/or Remand and supporting memorandum of law on or before April 27, 2020. The Commissioner shall file its response or its Motion to Affirm the decision of the Commissioner or or before June 26, 2020. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within 14 days of the Commissioner's response. Counsel should confer at the earliest practicable time if there will be an agreement to a voluntary remand and to filing of a joint motion for voluntary remand in lieu of full rounds of briefing. The Court will contact the parties shortly after filing of the Commissioner's response regarding a date for scheduling of oral argument. The parties are advised that the Court is unlikely to grant an extension of time of the dates as set forth in this scheduling order, and that failure to comply with the Court's scheduling order may result in a summary grant of relief for the opposing party. Any motion for extension of time must be filed at least 5 days in advance of the deadline that is due and must establish good cause with a particularized showing why the existing deadline could not be reasonably met despite the diligence of the party seeking an extension of time in accordance with the requirements of D. Conn. Local Civ. R. 7(b). It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/27/2019. (Mahler-Haug, A) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Although consent to a Magistrate Judge has been filed, due to the volume of appeals filed in this District, this case is hereby reassigned to Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/20/2019.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Benil Abraham on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Abraham, Benil) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without payment of fees and costs, which motion includes a sworn statement as to plaintiff's current financial circumstances. See Doc. #3 . Plaintiff has completed the required information. Plaintiff asserts that she is unable to afford to pay fees and costs, as she is unemployed and relies on State-funded cash assistance, which does not cover her monthly expenses. See generally id. at 3-4. Plaintiff also states that she receives food stamps. See id. at 5. At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that plaintiff is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, plaintiff's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 12/12/2019. (Katz, S.) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Answer deadline updated for Andrew M. Saul to 2/9/2020. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/11/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Standing Scheduling Order Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/11/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice re: Consent to Magistrate Judge by Jennifer M. Ames (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jennifer M. Ames. Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Ivan Michael Katz on behalf of Jennifer M. Ames (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Jennifer M. Ames. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.