This case was last updated from PACER on 04/14/2020 at 11:27:01 (UTC).

Americas Leading Finance, LLC v Centerbridge Partners, LP et al.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Americas Leading Finance, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Centerbridge Partners, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Silvia Carreno-Coll. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01084

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Silvia Carreno-Coll

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Americas Leading Finance, LLC

Defendants

CP CARCO GP, LTD

CP CARCO, LP

WHEELS HOLDINGS LLC

CP CARCO INTERMEDIATE, LTD

CENTERBRIDGE PARTNERS, LP

Wheels Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez

Attorney at Vicente & Cuebas

P. O. Box 11609

San Juan, PR 00910-1609

Matthew Gurgel

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Denisha S. Bacchus

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue, 14H Floor

New York, NY 10017

Federico Hernandez-Denton

Capitol Center Bldg. South Tower Ph-1, 239 Arterial Hostos Suite 1201

Hato Rey, PR 00918

Daniel M. Sullivan

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Harold D. Vicente-Colon

Attorney at Vicente & Cuebas

P. O. Box 11609

San Juan, PR 00910-1609

Alison B. Miller

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Andrew C. Indorf

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Michael S. Shuster

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz

P.O. Box 364148

San Juan, PR 00936-4148

Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez

Attorney at Reichard & Escalera

Po Box 364148

San Juan, PR 00936-4148

Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V

Attorney at Reichard & Escalera

Po Box 364148

San Juan, PR 00936-4148

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 4/24/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

#33

(#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vicente-Colon, Harold) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#32

(#32) NOTICE of Appearance by Federico Hernandez-Denton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hernandez-Denton, Federico) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#31

(#31) NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of Centerbridge Partners, LP, Wheels Holdings, LLC (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#30

(#30) NOTICE of Appearance by Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V on behalf of Centerbridge Partners, LP, Wheels Holdings, LLC (Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V, Sylvia) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

27 #3

Exhibit B - February 18, 2020 Letter

#27

(#27) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Americas Leading Finance, LLC Re: #24 First MOTION for Extension of Time until MARCH 23, 2020 to File Answer re: #2 Complaint,, filed by Americas Leading Finance, LLC, Notice of Docket Text Modification, filed by Wheels Holdings, LLC, Centerbridge Partners, LP filed by Americas Leading Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel M. Sullivan, #2 Exhibit A - February 14, 2020 E-mail, #3 Exhibit B - February 18, 2020 Letter, #4 Exhibit C - February 28, 2020 Transcript)(Sullivan, Daniel) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#24

(#27) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Americas Leading Finance, LLC Re: #24 First MOTION for Extension of Time until MARCH 23, 2020 to File Answer re: #2 Complaint,, filed by Americas Leading Finance, LLC, Notice of Docket Text Modification, filed by Wheels Holdings, LLC, Centerbridge Partners, LP filed by Americas Leading Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel M. Sullivan, #2 Exhibit A - February 14, 2020 E-mail, #3 Exhibit B - February 18, 2020 Letter, #4 Exhibit C - February 28, 2020 Transcript)(Sullivan, Daniel) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#10

(#10) Motion to allow Denisha Bacchus to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6805885) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez on behalf of Americas Leading Finance, LLC Responses due by 3/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#9

(#9) Motion to allow Matthew Gurgel to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6805880) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez on behalf of Americas Leading Finance, LLC Responses due by 3/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#8

(#8) Motion to allow Andrew Indorf to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6805873) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez on behalf of Americas Leading Finance, LLC Responses due by 3/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#7

(#7) Motion to allow Daniel Sullivan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6805869) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez on behalf of Americas Leading Finance, LLC Responses due by 3/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#6

(#6) Motion to allow Michael Shuster to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6805858) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez on behalf of Americas Leading Finance, LLC Responses due by 3/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Centerbridge Partners, LP, CP Carco GP, LTD, CP Carco Intermediate, LTD, CP Carco, LP, Wheels Holdings, LLC.(Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) Modified on 2/19/2020 to edit capital letters (rom). (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#1

RESTRICTED

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER granting #35 Motion to Restrict. Signed by Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 4/13/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 4/24/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) **CASE PARTICIPANTS**MOTION to dismiss as to All Defendants filed by Centerbridge Partners, LP, CP Carco Intermediate, LTD, CP Carco GP, LTD, Wheels Holdings, LLC, CP Carco, LP Responses due by 4/24/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vicente-Colon, Harold) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Appearance by Federico Hernandez-Denton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hernandez-Denton, Federico) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of Centerbridge Partners, LP, Wheels Holdings, LLC (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Appearance by Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V on behalf of Centerbridge Partners, LP, Wheels Holdings, LLC (Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V, Sylvia) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • Docket(#29) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been transferred to the docket of newly appointed U.S. District Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll. Signed by Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 04/07/2020. (gr) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER: Granting #24 "Motion to Respond to Extend Time for Moving Defendants to Respond to the Complaint." Answer the complaint or to otherwise plead by 3/23/2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 03/14/2020. (LMR) (Entered: 03/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Americas Leading Finance, LLC Re: #24 First MOTION for Extension of Time until MARCH 23, 2020 to File Answer re: #2 Complaint,, filed by Americas Leading Finance, LLC, Notice of Docket Text Modification, filed by Wheels Holdings, LLC, Centerbridge Partners, LP filed by Americas Leading Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel M. Sullivan, #2 Exhibit A - February 14, 2020 E-mail, #3 Exhibit B - February 18, 2020 Letter, #4 Exhibit C - February 28, 2020 Transcript)(Sullivan, Daniel) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to allow Denisha Bacchus to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6805885) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez on behalf of Americas Leading Finance, LLC Responses due by 3/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion to allow Matthew Gurgel to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6805880) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez on behalf of Americas Leading Finance, LLC Responses due by 3/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to allow Andrew Indorf to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6805873) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez on behalf of Americas Leading Finance, LLC Responses due by 3/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to allow Daniel Sullivan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6805869) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez on behalf of Americas Leading Finance, LLC Responses due by 3/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to allow Michael Shuster to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6805858) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez on behalf of Americas Leading Finance, LLC Responses due by 3/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Granting #1 "Motion to Restrict." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 02/18/2020. (LMR) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Centerbridge Partners, LP, CP Carco GP, LTD, CP Carco Intermediate, LTD, CP Carco, LP, Wheels Holdings, LLC.(Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) Modified on 2/19/2020 to edit capital letters (rom). (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) **CASE PARTICIPANTS**COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6794382.), filed by Americas Leading Finance, LLC. Service due by 5/14/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #5 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Summons - Centerbridge Partners, LP, #8 Summons Summons - CP Carco GP, LTD, #9 Summons Sumons - CP Carco Intermediate, LTD, #10 Summons Summons - CP Carco, LP, #11 Summons Summons - Wheels Holdings, LLC)(Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez on behalf of Americas Leading Finance, LLC Responses due by 2/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold) ***MODIFIED on 2/19/2020 to remove restriction. Standing Order No. 9 states that the Motion to Restrict... "shall be open to public inspection..."*** (rom). (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less