This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2021 at 10:14:04 (UTC).

AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION v. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE MEDICAID SERVICES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Carl J. Nichols. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02021

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl J. Nichols

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION

Defendant

CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan Patrick Mulvey

Attorney at AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION

1310 N. Courthouse Road, Suite 700

Arlington, VA 22201-2961

Eric R. Bolinder

Attorney at AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION

1310 N. Courthouse Rd, Suite 700

Arlington, VA 22201

Defendant Attorney

Paul Cirino

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES.(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

#7

(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/02/2021. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES served on 7/30/2021 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#5

(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/28/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/27/2021. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R. Bolinder on behalf of AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

3 #1

Notice and Consent

3 #3

Main Document

1 #8

Summons USAG

1 #7

Summons CMS

1 #6

Summons USAO-DC

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/14/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. According to Local Civil Rule 16.3, the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) are inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before October 14, 2021. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); (5) the possibility of prioritizing documents responsive to Plaintiff's requests and any discussions regarding whether Plaintiff's requests can be narrowed; and (6) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 23, 2021. (lccjn1) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES.(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/02/2021. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES served on 7/30/2021 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/28/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/27/2021. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R. Bolinder on behalf of AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8624814) filed by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons USAO-DC, #7 Summons CMS, #8 Summons USAG)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITIZENS FOR A HEALTHY COMMUNITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Cirino