This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2021 at 07:31:35 (UTC).

AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Tanya S. Chutkan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02405

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya S. Chutkan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN

Defendant

BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel J. Stotter

Attorney at STOTTER AND ASSOCIATES, LLC

408 Sw Monroe Avenue, Suite M210E

Corvallis, OR 97333

Lance Quaranto

541 Willamette St., Suite 305

Eugene, OR 97401

Defendant Attorney

John Moustakas

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Stotter on behalf of AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Moustakas, John) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/3/2022. (tb) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2021
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 12/3/22. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/23/22. (DJS) (Entered: 10/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Moustakas, John) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Stotter on behalf of AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (znmg) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8727371) filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Quaranto, Lance) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN is a litigant

Latest cases where BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Moustakas