This case was last updated from PACER on 03/18/2021 at 19:10:35 (UTC).

American Video Duplicating Inc. et al v. Citigroup Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2020 American Video Duplicating Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Citigroup Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03815

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

American Video Duplicating Inc.

Tush Law Ltd.

Kenneth M. Hahn

Defendants

MUFG Union Bank NA

Wells Fargo and Company

CitiGroup Inc.

Citibank N.A.

JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.

PayPal Holdings Inc

Bank Of America Corporation

Live Oak Banking Company

Bank of America N.A.

JPMorgan Chase and Co.

Newtek Business Services Inc.

Live Oak Bancshares, Inc

MUFG Bank Ltd.

US Bankcorp, Inc.

Doe Lenders

Harvest Small Business Finance LLC

Wells Fargo N.A.

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael E Adler

Attorney at GrayLaw Group, Inc.

26500 Agoura Road Suite 102-127

Calabasas, CA 91302

Benjamin Jared Meiselas

Attorney at Geragos and Geragos APC

644 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3411

Matthew Michael Hoesly

Attorney at Geragos and Geragos APC

644 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3411

Nitoj P Singh

Attorney at Dhillon Law Group Inc.

177 Post Street Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

Harmeet K Dhillon

Attorney at Dhillon Law Group Inc.

177 Post Street Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

Mark John Geragos

Attorney at Geragos and Geragos APC

644 South Figeuroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3411

Defendant Attorneys

Carolee A Hoover

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

Two Embarcadero Center Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111-3821

David C Powell

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

Two Embarcadero Center Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jamie D Wells

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

Two Embarcadero Center Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111-3821

Christopher S Comstock

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

71 South Wacker

Chicago, IL 60606

Lucia Nale

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

71 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Janice P Brown

Attorney at Meyers Nave Riback Silver and Wilson

633 West 5Th Street 26Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Arlene R Yang

Attorney at Brown Law Group ALC

633 West 5Th Street 26Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Stacy L Fode

Attorney at Nukk-Freeman and Cerra, P.C.

550 West B Street, 4Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Kevin M Lally

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

355 South Grand Avenue Suite 4200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Nina Huerta

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

300 South Grand Avenue Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3119

Other Attorneys

Megan A Suehiro

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bokius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Brianna Ricque Howard

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius

300 South Grand Avenue 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

John Warren Rissier

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

Michael S Kraut

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#138

(#138) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation #137 and FRCP 41(a)(1), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendants' pending Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint #133 is DENIED as moot; 2. The entire action and all claims asserted therein are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 3. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs; and 4. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#137

(#137) Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A..(Nazareth, Matthew) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#135

(#135) NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Joint Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Wells Fargo N.A.. (Cullen, Brendan) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#134

(#134) NOTICE of Non-Receipt of Opposition to Joint Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Wells Fargo N.A.. (Cullen, Brendan) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#132

(#132) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition,, #80 , filed by Plaintiff American Video Duplicating Inc.(Adler, Michael) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#131

(#131) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND BY FILING A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 21 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS ORDER (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS THEREIN) #83 , #117 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#80

(#132) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition,, #80 , filed by Plaintiff American Video Duplicating Inc.(Adler, Michael) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

9 #2

Attachment

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs American Video Duplicating Inc., Kenneth M. Hahn, Tush Law Ltd.. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Meiselas, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Meiselas, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#5

(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants AMERICAN VIDEO DUPLICATING INC, KENNETH M. HAHN DBA CAL STATE FINANCIAL, TUSH LAW LTD. (Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#1

(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs American Video Duplicating Inc., Kenneth M. Hahn, Tush Law Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

172 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#138) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation #137 and FRCP 41(a)(1), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendants' pending Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint #133 is DENIED as moot; 2. The entire action and all claims asserted therein are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 3. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs; and 4. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#137) Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A..(Nazareth, Matthew) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#136) The hearing on the MOTION to Dismiss #133 , scheduled for February 1, 2021 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#135) NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Joint Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Wells Fargo N.A.. (Cullen, Brendan) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#134) NOTICE of Non-Receipt of Opposition to Joint Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Wells Fargo N.A.. (Cullen, Brendan) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#133) Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Defendants Citibank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Live Oak Banking Company, and Harvest Small Business Finance filed by Defendant Wells Fargo N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 2/1/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (Cullen, Brendan) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#132) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition,, #80 , filed by Plaintiff American Video Duplicating Inc.(Adler, Michael) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#131) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND BY FILING A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 21 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS ORDER (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS THEREIN) #83 , #117 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#130) The hearing on the MOTION TO DISMISS #117 , scheduled for November 23, 2020 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) REPLY in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Corrected First Amended Complaint by Defendants U.S. Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Live Oak Banking Company, and Harvest Small Business Finance 117 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo N.A.. (Cullen, Brendan) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
118 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #9 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. 1) Official case number is MISSING assigned Judge and Magistrate initials. Case number to read correctly as: 2:20-cv-03815-ODW-AGR. 2) Attachment 1 is Not identified as ATTACHMENT 1". Only page 1 and 2 of complaint attached of which.. Page 1 still reflects the INCORRECT street address and contact information as to the GrayLaw Group of which filer filed an Errata docket no. 8. Therefore, a clean attachment of ONLY the CASE CAPTION should be prepared... (Or Please correct GrayLaw Group information per Your errata, on page 1 and and remove the unnecessary incomplete partial text of the complaint on page. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs American Video Duplicating Inc., Kenneth M. Hahn, Tush Law Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs American Video Duplicating Inc., Kenneth M. Hahn, Tush Law Ltd.. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Meiselas, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Meiselas, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants AMERICAN VIDEO DUPLICATING INC, KENNETH M. HAHN DBA CAL STATE FINANCIAL, TUSH LAW LTD. (Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26234546 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff AMERICAN VIDEO DUPLICATING INC, KENNETH M. HAHN DBA CAL STATE FINANCIAL, TUSH LAW LTD. (Attorney Mark John Geragos added to party AMERICAN VIDEO DUPLICATING INC(pty:bkmov), Attorney Mark John Geragos added to party KENNETH M. HAHN DBA CAL STATE FINANCIAL(pty:bkmov), Attorney Mark John Geragos added to party TUSH LAW LTD(pty:bkmov))(Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Newtek Business Service Group is a litigant

Latest cases where US Bankcorp is a litigant

Latest cases where Paypal Holdings Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Live Oak Banking Company is a litigant