This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/29/2020 at 09:44:00 (UTC).

AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF KUWAIT v. AMERICAN UNIVERSITY

Case Summary

On 03/30/2020 AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF KUWAIT filed an Other lawsuit against AMERICAN UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ketanji Brown Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00851

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ketanji Brown Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American University of Kuwait

Defendant

AMERICAN UNIVERSITY

4400 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, Dc, DC 20016

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert W. Ludwig, Jr.

Attorney at LUDWIG & ROBINSON PLLC

1717 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 450

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorney

Stephanie H. Bald

Attorney at KELLY IP, LLP

1919 M Street, N.W., Suite 610

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF KUWAIT (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ludwig, Robert) (Entered: 05/23/2020)

8 #10

Text of Proposed Order

8 #9

Exhibit I

8 #8

Exhibit H

8 #7

Exhibit G

8 #6

Exhibit F

8 #5

Exhibit E

8 #4

Exhibit D

8 #3

Exhibit C

8 #2

Exhibit B

8 #1

Exhibit A - Memorandum in Support

#8

(#8) Partial MOTION to Dismiss by AMERICAN UNIVERSITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Bald, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie H. Bald on behalf of AMERICAN UNIVERSITY (Bald, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#6

(#6) GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/6/2020. (jag) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF AGREED TIME FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING by AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF KUWAIT (Ludwig, Robert) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE.AMERICAN UNIVERSITY waiver sent on 3/31/2020, answer due 5/30/2020. (Ludwig, Robert) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to AMERICAN UNIVERSITY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #8 Partial Motion to Dismiss. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's response re #8 is due on or before 6/8/2020. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/27/2020. (jag) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF KUWAIT (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ludwig, Robert) (Entered: 05/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Partial MOTION to Dismiss by AMERICAN UNIVERSITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Bald, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie H. Bald on behalf of AMERICAN UNIVERSITY (Bald, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/6/2020. (jag) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF AGREED TIME FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING by AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF KUWAIT (Ludwig, Robert) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE.AMERICAN UNIVERSITY waiver sent on 3/31/2020, answer due 5/30/2020. (Ludwig, Robert) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to AMERICAN UNIVERSITY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by American University of Kuwait (Ludwig, Robert) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AMERICAN UNIVERSITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6971208) filed by American University of Kuwait. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ludwig, Robert) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN UNIVERSITY is a litigant