This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/04/2020 at 08:15:29 (UTC).

AMERICAN TRAIN DISPATCHERS ASSOCIATION et al v. NATIONAL RAILWAY LABOR CONFERENCE et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 AMERICAN TRAIN DISPATCHERS ASSOCIATION filed a Labor - Railway Labor Act lawsuit against NATIONAL RAILWAY LABOR CONFERENCE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Trevor N. McFadden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02139

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Railway Labor Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Trevor N. McFadden

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS & AEROSPACE WORKERS, AFL-CIO ("IAM")

TRANSPORT WORKERS UNION

BROTHERHOOD OF RAILROAD SIGNALMEN

INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF BOILERMAKERS

INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION

AMERICAN TRAIN DISPATCHERS ASSOCIATION

TRANSPORTATION COMMUNICATIONS UNION - IAM

BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION/IBT

INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - MECHANICAL DIVISION

NATIONAL CONFERENCE OF FIREMEN & OILERS DISTRICT OF LOCAL 32BJ, SEIU

INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS

BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINMEN DIVISION/IBT RAIL CONFERENCE

Defendants

The Kansas City Southern Railway Company

SOO LINE RAILROAD COMPANY

NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY

CSX TRANSPORATION, INC.

GRAND TRUNK WESTERN RAILROAD COMPANY

NATIONAL RAILWAY LABOR CONFERENCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth A. Roma

Attorney at GUERRIERI, CLAYMON, BARTOS, PARCELLI & ROMA PC

1900 M Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20036

John J. Grunert, Jr.

Attorney at Guerrieri, Bartos & Roma, PC

1900 M Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

5 #7

Waiver of Service - UPRR

5 #6

Waiver of Service - Soo Line

5 #5

Waiver of Service - NSR

5 #4

Waiver of Service - KCS

5 #3

Waiver of Service - GTW

5 #2

Waiver of Service - CSXT

5 #1

Waiver of Service - BNSF

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#2

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketENTERED IN ERROR ON THE WRONG CASE.....Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/5/2020. (znbn) Modified on 9/18/2020 (znbn). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/11/2020; CSX TRANSPORATION, INC. waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/11/2020; GRAND TRUNK WESTERN RAILROAD COMPANY waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/11/2020; KANSAS CITY SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/11/2020; NATIONAL RAILWAY LABOR CONFERENCE waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/11/2020; NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/11/2020; SOO LINE RAILROAD COMPANY waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/11/2020; UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service - BNSF, #2 Waiver of Service - CSXT, #3 Waiver of Service - GTW, #4 Waiver of Service - KCS, #5 Waiver of Service - NSR, #6 Waiver of Service - Soo Line, #7 Waiver of Service - UPRR)(Grunert, John) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/6/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Grunert, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Grunert, John) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7429113) filed by TRANSPORTATION COMMUNICATIONS UNION - IAM, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION, BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINMEN DIVISION/IBT RAIL CONFERENCE, AMERICAN TRAIN DISPATCHERS ASSOCIATION, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - MECHANICAL DIVISION, BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION/IBT, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, TRANSPORT WORKERS UNION, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF BOILERMAKERS, BROTHERHOOD OF RAILROAD SIGNALMEN, NATIONAL CONFERENCE OF FIREMEN & OILERS DISTRICT OF LOCAL 32BJ, SEIU, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS & AEROSPACE WORKERS, AFL-CIO ("IAM"). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Roma, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where International Brotherhood of Boilermakers is a litigant

Latest cases where Transport Workers Union Local 100 is a litigant

Latest cases where Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen is a litigant

Latest cases where CSX TRANSPORATION INC is a litigant