This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/10/2020 at 14:18:18 (UTC).

American Strategic Insurance Company et al v. General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 American Strategic Insurance Company filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J P Stadtmueller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00888

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J P Stadtmueller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Progressive Universal Insurance Company

American Strategic Insurance Company

Lance Mortensen

Defendants

General Motors Company

General Motors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew F Policastro

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

123 N Wacker Dr - Ste 1800

Chicago, IL 60606

Michelle D Hurley

Attorney at Yost & Baill LLP

220 S 6Th St - Ste 2050

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

10 #1

Exhibit A

#11

#12

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against General Motors LLC filed by Lance Mortensen, American Strategic Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company.(asc)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 7/31/2020. #9 Plaintiffs' Motion to Substitute Party is DENIED. #10 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint is GRANTED; the amended complaint (Docket #10-1) shall be the OPERATIVE complaint. (cc: all counsel) (jm)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Policastro, Matthew)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant by All Plaintiffs. (Policastro, Matthew)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Alias Summons & Complaint on 06-26-2020 by Adam Golden (Policastro, Matthew)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketSummons Reissued as to General Motors Company. (asc)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Policastro, Matthew)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint on 06-16-2020 by General Motors Company c/o The Corporation Company as agent for service (Policastro, Matthew)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to General Motors Company. (asc)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTACHMENTS Civil Cover Sheet by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint. (Policastro, Matthew)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE Statement by Progressive Universal Insurance Company. (Policastro, Matthew)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE Statement by American Strategic Insurance Company. (Policastro, Matthew)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Policastro, Matthew)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by American Strategic Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3476648)(Policastro, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive Universal Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew F. Policastro