This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 09:24:38 (UTC).

American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., et al v. Xavier Becerra

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Xavier Becerra. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen L. Stevenson and Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10645

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association

National Press Photographers Association

American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc.

Defendant

Xavier Becerra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Caleb Randall Trotter

Attorney at Pacific Legal Foundation

930 G Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Jeremy Brennan Talcott

Attorney at Pacific Legal Foundation

1212 West Amerige Avenue

Fullerton, CA 92833

James M Manley

Attorney at Pacific Legal Foundation

3241 East Shea Boulevard Suite 108

Phoenix, AZ 85028

Defendant Attorney

Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda

Attorney at CAAG - Office of Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

33 #1

Memorandum

#33

(#33) NOTICE filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#35

(#35) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS #34 RE: Notice of Motion to Dismiss #33 , by Clerk of Court. The document is accepted as filed. (bm) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#1

(#9) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Xavier Becerra. (esa) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association. (Trotter, Caleb) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association, identifying American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association. (Trotter, Caleb) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

12 #1

Memorandum ISO PI Motion

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association. (Trotter, Caleb) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#32

(#32) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File to Respond to Initial Complaint By Not More Than 30 Days (L.R. 8-3) filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra.(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Xavier Becerra. (esa) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association, identifying American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association. (Talcott, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#12

(#36) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Prohibiting Defendant, his officers, agents, servants, and employees from enforcing Cal. Labor Code 2750.3(c)(2)(B)(ix) and (x) . Motion #12 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#36

(#36) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Prohibiting Defendant, his officers, agents, servants, and employees from enforcing Cal. Labor Code 2750.3(c)(2)(B)(ix) and (x) . Motion #12 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

12 #2

Proposed Order Granting PI Motion

#34

(#34) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Dismiss #33 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions /Petitions/Requests-Dismiss Case. Docket entry text does not indicate noticed motion hearing date and time In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeremy Brennan Talcott counsel for Plaintiff American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association. Adding Jeremy Talcott as counsel of record for American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association. (Attorney Jeremy Brennan Talcott added to party American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association(pty:pla))(Talcott, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Prohibiting Defendant, his officers, agents, servants, and employees from enforcing Cal. Labor Code 2750.3(c)(2)(B)(ix) and (x) . Motion #12 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS #34 RE: Notice of Motion to Dismiss #33 , by Clerk of Court. The document is accepted as filed. (bm) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Dismiss #33 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions /Petitions/Requests-Dismiss Case. Docket entry text does not indicate noticed motion hearing date and time In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File to Respond to Initial Complaint By Not More Than 30 Days (L.R. 8-3) filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra.(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #20 Non-Resident Attorney James M Manley APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs American Society of Journalists and Authors, inc., and National Press Photographers Association, designating Jeremy Talcott as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MINUTE ORDER ( IN CHAMBERS ) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez Re: EX PARTE APPLICATION #27 . Plaintiffs' ex parte application is DENIED. Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction is set for hearing March 9, 2020. Please see Order for further details. (wm) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) REPLY In Support of Motion EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to TRO re Prohibiting Defendant, his officers, agents, servants, and employees from enforcing Cal. Labor Code 2750.3(c)(2)(B)(ix) and (x) until resolution of motion for preliminary injuncti #27 filed by Plaintiffs American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., National Press Photographers Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Caleb R. Trotter)(Trotter, Caleb) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to TRO re Prohibiting Defendant, his officers, agents, servants, and employees from enforcing Cal. Labor Code 2750.3(c)(2)(B)(ix) and (x) until resolution of motion for preliminary injuncti #27 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Attorney Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft))(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to TRO re Prohibiting Defendant, his officers, agents, servants, and employees from enforcing Cal. Labor Code 2750.3(c)(2)(B)(ix) and (x) until resolution of motion for preliminary injunction filed by Plaintiffs American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., National Press Photographers Association. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice to Counsel of Ex Parte Application, #3 Proposed Order) (Trotter, Caleb) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James M. Manley. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Xavier Becerra. (esa) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association, identifying American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association. (Talcott, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeremy Brennan Talcott counsel for Plaintiff American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association. Adding Jeremy Talcott as counsel of record for American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association. (Attorney Jeremy Brennan Talcott added to party American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association(pty:pla))(Talcott, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association. (Trotter, Caleb) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association, identifying American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association. (Trotter, Caleb) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association. (Trotter, Caleb) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24965880 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association. (Attorney Caleb Randall Trotter added to party American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association(pty:pla))(Trotter, Caleb) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.