This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/30/2020 at 08:12:57 (UTC).

American Sentinel Insurance Company v. AR Xpress LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 American Sentinel Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AR Xpress LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Randy Crane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00028

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Randy Crane

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Sentinel Insurance Company

Defendants

AR Xpress LLC

Edna Maciel-Castorena

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen A Melendi

Attorney at Tollefson Bradley Ball Mitchell, LLP

2811 Mckinney Ave, Ste 250 W

Dallas, TX 75204

Matthew Rigney

Attorney at Tollefson Bradley et al

2811 Mckinney Ave, Ste 250 West

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendant Attorneys

Alexis Lizet Espejel

Attorney at The Voss Law Firm PLLC

26619 Interstate 45

The Woodlands, TX 77380

Loren G Klitsas

Attorney at Klitsas Vercher PC

550 Westcott, Ste 570

Houston, TX 77007

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Summons

#4

3 #1

Continuation

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by American Sentinel Insurance Company, filed.(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by American Sentinel Insurance Company, filed.(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Clerks ENTRY OF DEFAULT against Edna Maciel-Castorena (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER on #8 Request for Entry of Default (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST for Entry of Default against Edna Maciel-Castorena by American Sentinel Insurance Company, filed.(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AR Xpress LLC, filed.(Martinez, Alexis) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Edna Maciel-Castorena served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020, filed.(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to AR Xpress LLC served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020, filed.(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to AR Xpress LLC, Edna Maciel-Castorena. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Randy Crane (by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24066705) filed by American Sentinel Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melendi, Stephen) Modified on 1/30/2020 (klopez, 7). (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Rigney

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen Andrew Melendi