This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2022 at 09:27:54 (UTC).

American Patents LLC v. Renesas Electronics Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2022 American Patents LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Renesas Electronics Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Derek T. Gilliland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00773

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Derek T. Gilliland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Patents LLC

Defendants

Renesas Electronics Corporation

Renesas Electronics America Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

C. Ryan Pinckney

Catherine Bartles

Larry D. Thompson

Matthew Antonelli

Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis

Zachariah Harrington

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16244506). No Summons requested at this time, filed by American Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of American Patents LLC (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Bartles on behalf of American Patents LLC (Bartles, Catherine) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE Notice Regarding Agreed Request to Extend Deadline and Waiver of Service by American Patents LLC (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#6

(#6) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Patents LLC. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry D. Thompson on behalf of American Patents LLC (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Antonelli on behalf of American Patents LLC (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Ryan Pinckney on behalf of American Patents LLC (Pinckney, C.) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Ryan Pinckney on behalf of American Patents LLC (Pinckney, C.) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Antonelli on behalf of American Patents LLC (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry D. Thompson on behalf of American Patents LLC (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Patents LLC. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Renesas Electronics America Inc. and Renesas Electronics Corporation answer due 10/11/2022. (zv) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE Notice Regarding Agreed Request to Extend Deadline and Waiver of Service by American Patents LLC (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Bartles on behalf of American Patents LLC (Bartles, Catherine) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of American Patents LLC (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (zv) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (zv) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16244506). No Summons requested at this time, filed by American Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less