This case was last updated from PACER on 01/25/2020 at 07:35:37 (UTC).

American Patents LLC v. Juniper Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 American Patents LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Juniper Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00879

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Patents LLC

Defendant

Juniper Networks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Ryan Pinckney

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Ste 450

Houston, TX 77006

Matthew J Antonelli

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Ste 450

Houston, TX 77006

Catherine Susan Bartles

Attorney at The Stafford Davis Firm, PC - Tyler

The People'S Petroleum Building, Thirteenth Floor, 102 North College Avenue

Tyler, TX 75702

Larry Dean Thompson, Jr

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Ste 450

Houston, TX 77006

Zachariah Harrington

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Ste 450

Houston, TX 77006

Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis

Attorney at The Stafford Davis Firm, PC - Tyler

815 S Broadway Ave

Tyler, TX 75701

Defendant Attorneys

Alan Michael Fisch

Attorney at Fisch Sigler LLP - DC

5301 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20015

Jeffrey M. Saltman

Attorney at Fisch Sigler LLP - DC

5301 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20015

R. William Sigler

Attorney at Fisch Sigler LLP - DC

5301 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20015

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Juniper Networks, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including February 26, 2020. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/24/2020. (daj, ) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#16

(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Susan Bartles on behalf of American Patents LLC (Bartles, Catherine) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#14

(#14) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Juniper Networks, Inc..( Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by R. William Sigler on behalf of Juniper Networks, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7578199. (Sigler, R.) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey M. Saltman on behalf of Juniper Networks, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7578135. (Saltman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Michael Fisch on behalf of Juniper Networks, Inc. (Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of American Patents LLC (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Juniper Networks, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by American Patents LLC of Related Cases (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Patents LLC (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Ryan Pinckney on behalf of American Patents LLC (Pinckney, Christopher) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of American Patents LLC (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Antonelli on behalf of American Patents LLC (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Juniper Networks, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including February 26, 2020. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/24/2020. (daj, ) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Susan Bartles on behalf of American Patents LLC (Bartles, Catherine) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Juniper Networks, Inc. to 1/27/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, ) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Juniper Networks, Inc..( Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by R. William Sigler on behalf of Juniper Networks, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7578199. (Sigler, R.) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey M. Saltman on behalf of Juniper Networks, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7578135. (Saltman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Michael Fisch on behalf of Juniper Networks, Inc. (Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of American Patents LLC (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Patents LLC. Juniper Networks, Inc. served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/25/2019. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Juniper Networks, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by American Patents LLC of Related Cases (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Patents LLC (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Ryan Pinckney on behalf of American Patents LLC (Pinckney, Christopher) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of American Patents LLC (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Antonelli on behalf of American Patents LLC (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Juniper Networks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7546694.), filed by American Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Juniper Networks, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where American Patents LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew J Antonelli