This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2021 at 09:13:28 (UTC).

American Patents LLC v. CalAmp Wireless Networks Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 American Patents LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against CalAmp Wireless Networks Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00716

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Patents LLC

Defendant

CalAmp Wireless Networks Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Catherine Susan Bartles

Attorney at The Stafford Davis Firm, PC - Tyler

815 S Broadway Ave

Tyler, TX 75701

Christopher Ryan Pinckney

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Ste 450

Houston, TX 77006

Larry Dean Thompson, Jr

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Ste 450

Houston, TX 77006

Matthew J Antonelli

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Ste 450

Houston, TX 77006

Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis

Attorney at The Stafford Davis Firm, PC - Tyler

815 S Broadway Ave

Tyler, TX 75701

Zachariah Harrington

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Ste 450

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorney

David Matthew Lisch

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP - Dallas

2121 N. Pearl Street, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75201-2469

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

(#3) NOTICE by American Patents LLC of Related Cases (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Patents LLC (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to CalAmp Wireless Networks Corporation. (mem) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Patents LLC. CalAmp Wireless Networks Corporation served on 9/22/2021, answer due 10/13/2021. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of American Patents LLC (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Antonelli on behalf of American Patents LLC (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Ryan Pinckney on behalf of American Patents LLC (Pinckney, Christopher) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of American Patents LLC (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Susan Bartles on behalf of American Patents LLC (Bartles, Catherine) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#12

(#12) ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CalAmp Wireless Networks Corporation. (Lisch, David) Modified on 10/12/2021 (rpc, ). (Entered: 10/11/2021)

#13

(#13) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CalAmp Wireless Networks Corporation.( Lisch, David) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#14

(#14) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CalAmp Wireless Networks Corporation.( Lisch, David) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CalAmp Wireless Networks Corporation to 11/29/2021. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(mem) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CalAmp Wireless Networks Corporation.( Lisch, David) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CalAmp Wireless Networks Corporation to 11/12/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CalAmp Wireless Networks Corporation.( Lisch, David) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer submitted by CalAmp Wireless Networks Corporation. The first request exceeds the total allowed days, which is 30 days, when using the application. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CalAmp Wireless Networks Corporation. (Lisch, David) Modified on 10/12/2021 (rpc, ). (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Susan Bartles on behalf of American Patents LLC (Bartles, Catherine) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of American Patents LLC (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Ryan Pinckney on behalf of American Patents LLC (Pinckney, Christopher) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Antonelli on behalf of American Patents LLC (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of American Patents LLC (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Patents LLC. CalAmp Wireless Networks Corporation served on 9/22/2021, answer due 10/13/2021. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to CalAmp Wireless Networks Corporation. (mem) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Patents LLC (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by American Patents LLC of Related Cases (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mem, ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (mem) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against CalAmp Wireless Networks Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8582581.), filed by American Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Patents LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Lisch