This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/13/2020 at 11:04:41 (UTC).

American Patents LLC v. Arista Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 American Patents LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Arista Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00740

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Patents LLC

Defendant

Arista Networks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

C. Ryan Pinckney

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Suite 450

Houston, TX 77006

Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis

Attorney at The Stafford Davis Firm, PC

815 South Broadway Avenue

Tyler, TX 75701

Zachariah Harrington

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Suite 450

Houston, TX 77006

Larry D. Thompson

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Suite 450

Houston, TX 77006

Matthew Antonelli

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Suite 450

Houston, TX 77006

Catherine Bartles

Attorney at Stafford Davis Firm, PC

815 S Broadway Ave

Tyler, TX 75701

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Original Complaint by American Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Patents LLC. Arista Networks, Inc. served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#12

(#12) Summons Issued as to Arista Networks, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#11

(#11) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by American Patents LLC. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Ryan Pinckney on behalf of American Patents LLC (Pinckney, C.) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Antonelli on behalf of American Patents LLC (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry D. Thompson on behalf of American Patents LLC (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Related Cases by American Patents LLC (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of American Patents LLC (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 08/15/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13864724). No Summons requested at this time, filed by American Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

3 #1

Supplemental Standing Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19 Court Procedures

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Standing Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19 Court Procedures)(mc5) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness in Patent Cases (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Arista Networks, Inc. answer due 11/5/2020. (mc5) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. It is therefore ORDERED as follows: The deadline for Defendant Arista Networks, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Original Complaint shall be extended by forty-five (45) days to November 5, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Original Complaint by American Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Patents LLC. Arista Networks, Inc. served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to Arista Networks, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by American Patents LLC. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Ryan Pinckney on behalf of American Patents LLC (Pinckney, C.) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Antonelli on behalf of American Patents LLC (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry D. Thompson on behalf of American Patents LLC (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Related Cases by American Patents LLC (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Patents LLC. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Bartles on behalf of American Patents LLC (Bartles, Catherine) (Entered: 08/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of American Patents LLC (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 08/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13864724). No Summons requested at this time, filed by American Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Standing Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19 Court Procedures)(mc5) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arista Networks, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where American Patents LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Catherine Susan Bartles

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew J Antonelli