This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/06/2020 at 08:13:48 (UTC).

AMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 AMERICAN OVERSIGHT filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against U S DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dabney L. Friedrich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02153

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dabney L. Friedrich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN OVERSIGHT

Defendants

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE

NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU

U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hart W. Wood

Attorney at AMERICAN OVERSIGHT

1030 15Th Street, Nw, Suite B255

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorney

Keri Lane Berman

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L Street, Nw, Room 11312

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Berman, Keri) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Berman, Keri) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

3 #1

Notice and Consent

#3

(#3) SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#2

(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

1 #9

Summons National Guard

1 #8

Summons DOD

1 #7

Summons ICE

1 #6

Summons CBP

1 #5

Summons DHS

1 #4

Summons DOJ

1 #3

Summons US Att'y General

1 #2

Summons USAO

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7436045) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons USAO, #3 Summons US Att'y General, #4 Summons DOJ, #5 Summons DHS, #6 Summons CBP, #7 Summons ICE, #8 Summons DOD, #9 Summons National Guard)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #5 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 9, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 1, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Berman, Keri) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/1/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA requests, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the requests and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before October 1, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 17, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Berman, Keri) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7436045) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons USAO, #3 Summons US Att'y General, #4 Summons DOJ, #5 Summons DHS, #6 Summons CBP, #7 Summons ICE, #8 Summons DOD, #9 Summons National Guard)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Guard Bureau is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN OVERSIGHT is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Department of Defense is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE is a litigant