This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/10/2023 at 08:20:17 (UTC).

American National Insurance Company v. Fortun

Case Summary

On 11/11/2022 American National Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Fortun. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Beth Bloom and Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-23705

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

Referral Judge

Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American National Insurance Company

Defendant

Erica Fortun

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fred Conwell Marshall, II

Attorney at Hill Ward Henderson PA

101 E. Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

Brett Joseph Preston

Attorney at Hill Ward Henderson

101 E. Kennedy Blvd., Suite 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

Jasiel Tabares

Attorney at Tabares Law PA

12595 Sw 137 Avenue, Suite 206

Miami, FL 33186

Anthony Accetta

Attorney at Law Offices of Anthony Accetta, PA

135 San Lorenzo Avenue, Ph 820

Coral Gables, FL 33146

Lazaro Vazquez

Attorney at Law Office of Lazaro Vazquez, P.A.

145 Almeria Avenue

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Order

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Amended Pleadings due by 2/20/2023. Discovery due by 8/8/2023. Fact Discovery due by 8/8/2023. Expert Discovery due by 8/8/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 2/20/2023. Mediation Deadline 8/22/2023. In Limine Motions due by 8/30/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2023. Motions due by 8/30/2023. Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/20/2023. JURY TRIAL set for 12/4/2023 at 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. CALENDAR CALL set for 11/28/2023 at 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 8/22/2023. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (caw) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 12/22/2022)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jasiel Tabares on behalf of Erica Fortun. Attorney Jasiel Tabares added to party Erica Fortun(pty:dft). (Tabares, Jasiel) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Accetta on behalf of Erica Fortun. Attorney Anthony Accetta added to party Erica Fortun(pty:dft). (Accetta, Anthony) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by American National Insurance Company. Erica Fortun served on 11/28/2022, response/answer due 12/19/2022. (Preston, Brett) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/14/2022. See attached document for full details. (caw) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by American National Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American National Group LLC, Corporate Parent BAMR US Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent BAMR US Holdings (Bermuda) I Ltd., Corporate Parent BAM Re Holdings Ltd., Corporate Parent Brookfield Asset Management Reinsurance Partners Ltd. for American National Insurance Company (Preston, Brett) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

1 #5

Summon(s)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Howard A. Tescher as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 8/3/2023 at 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Preston, Brett) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Amended Pleadings due by 2/20/2023. Discovery due by 8/8/2023. Fact Discovery due by 8/8/2023. Expert Discovery due by 8/8/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 2/20/2023. Mediation Deadline 8/22/2023. In Limine Motions due by 8/30/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2023. Motions due by 8/30/2023. Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/20/2023. JURY TRIAL set for 12/4/2023 at 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. CALENDAR CALL set for 11/28/2023 at 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 8/22/2023. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (caw) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by American National Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Preston, Brett) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jasiel Tabares on behalf of Erica Fortun. Attorney Jasiel Tabares added to party Erica Fortun(pty:dft). (Tabares, Jasiel) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by January 18, 2023. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Erica Fortun. Attorney Lazaro Vazquez added to party Erica Fortun(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vazquez, Lazaro) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Accetta on behalf of Erica Fortun. Attorney Anthony Accetta added to party Erica Fortun(pty:dft). (Accetta, Anthony) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by American National Insurance Company. Erica Fortun served on 11/28/2022, response/answer due 12/19/2022. (Preston, Brett) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/14/2022. See attached document for full details. (caw) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by American National Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American National Group LLC, Corporate Parent BAMR US Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent BAMR US Holdings (Bermuda) I Ltd., Corporate Parent BAM Re Holdings Ltd., Corporate Parent Brookfield Asset Management Reinsurance Partners Ltd. for American National Insurance Company (Preston, Brett) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Erica Fortun. (aao) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (aao) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Erica Fortun. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16094781, filed by American National Insurance Company of Galveston, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summon(s))(Preston, Brett) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brett Justice Preston