This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2022 at 07:54:33 (UTC).

American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Lyke et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Lyke. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is N. Reid Neureiter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02933

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

N. Reid Neureiter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Defendants

Brian M. Lyke

Nikela M. Lyke

Sierra R. Beltran

Sierra (I) R. Beltran

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian John Spano

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

1601 19Th Street,, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorney

Collin Joseph Earl

Attorney at Earl & Earl PLLC-Colorado Springs

1259 Lake Plaza Drive, Suite 230

Colorado Springs, CO 80906

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Policy

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Underlying Complaint

#2

(#2) NOTICE of filing CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET by Plaintiff American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Spano, Brian) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Brian and Nikela Lyke by Plaintiff American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Spano, Brian) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Sierra and Kalani Beltran by Plaintiff American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Spano, Brian) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Summons

6 #2

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 3 November 2021. Consent Form due by 1/25/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/1/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Collin Joseph Earl on behalf of Sierra R. Beltran, Sierra (I) R. BeltranAttorney Collin Joseph Earl added to party Sierra R. Beltran(pty:dft), Attorney Collin Joseph Earl added to party Sierra (I) R. Beltran(pty:dft) (Earl, Collin) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sierra R. Beltran, Sierra (I) R. Beltran.(Earl, Collin) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Brian M. Lyke served on 11/20/2021, answer due 12/11/2021; Nikela M. Lyke served on 11/20/2021, answer due 12/11/2021. (Spano, Brian) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Sierra R. Beltran served on 11/20/2021, answer due 12/11/2021; Sierra (I) R. Beltran served on 11/20/2021, answer due 12/11/2021. (Spano, Brian) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Sierra R. Beltran served on 11/20/2021, answer due 12/11/2021; Sierra (I) R. Beltran served on 11/20/2021, answer due 12/11/2021. (Spano, Brian) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Brian M. Lyke served on 11/20/2021, answer due 12/11/2021; Nikela M. Lyke served on 11/20/2021, answer due 12/11/2021. (Spano, Brian) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sierra R. Beltran, Sierra (I) R. Beltran.(Earl, Collin) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Collin Joseph Earl on behalf of Sierra R. Beltran, Sierra (I) R. BeltranAttorney Collin Joseph Earl added to party Sierra R. Beltran(pty:dft), Attorney Collin Joseph Earl added to party Sierra (I) R. Beltran(pty:dft) (Earl, Collin) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 3 November 2021. Consent Form due by 1/25/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/1/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Sierra and Kalani Beltran by Plaintiff American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Spano, Brian) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Brian and Nikela Lyke by Plaintiff American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Spano, Brian) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of filing CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET by Plaintiff American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Spano, Brian) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against Kalani Beltran, Sierra R. Beltran, Brian M. Lyke, Nikela M. Lyke (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8157165)Attorney Brian John Spano added to party American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company (pty:pla), filed by American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Underlying Complaint)(Spano, Brian) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MODERN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Collin J. Earl